EP1639029 - BIODEGRADABLE POLY(BETA-AMINO ESTERS) AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY Five Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142-1493 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGER, Robert 98 Montvale Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | 02 /
LYNN, David, M. 3334 Conservancy Lane Middleton, WI 53562 / US | 03 /
ANDERSON, Daniel, G. 270 Belknap Street Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 04 /
AKINC, Akin 1488 Washington Street Newton, MA 02465 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04753364.1 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US16521 | Priority number, date | US20030446444 | 28.05.2003 Original published format: US 446444 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004106411 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1639029 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639029 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00, A61K9/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
C08G69/44 (EP,US);
A61K47/59 (EP,US);
A61K47/593 (EP,US);
A61K47/645 (EP,US);
A61K47/6925 (EP,US);
A61K9/5138 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C08G63/40 (EP,US);
C08G63/6856 (EP,US);
C08G73/02 (EP,US);
C08G73/0273 (EP,US);
C08G73/028 (EP,US);
C08G73/06 (EP,US);
C08G73/0611 (EP,US);
C08G73/0616 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L77/04 (EP,US);
C08L79/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE POLY(BETA-AMINOESTER) UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2006/13] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE POLY(BETA-AMINO ESTERS) AND USES THEREOF | [2006/13] | French: | ESTERS POLY(BETA-AMINO) BIODEGRADABLES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 23.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07013193.3 / EP1903068 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CH | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | CZ | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | EE | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | LI | 11.07.2007 | NL | 11.07.2007 | PL | 11.07.2007 | RO | 11.07.2007 | SI | 11.07.2007 | SK | 11.07.2007 | TR | 11.07.2007 | BG | 11.10.2007 | SE | 11.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | HU | 12.01.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
HU | 12.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SI | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
EE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
RO | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
SK | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
CH | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
LI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
PL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
BG | 11.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1668502 (NII MONOMEROW DLJA SINTETITSCH) [A] 1-19,57-72* the whole document *; | [A]US4224365 (ALI-ZAIDI SYED R) [A] 1-19,57-72 * the whole document *; | [A]US4348511 (HAUG THEOBALD) [A] 1-19,57-72 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0959092 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [A] 1-19,57-72 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002131951 (LANGER ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-19,57-72 * the whole document * |