EP1631378 - POLYESTER PREPARATION PROCESS USING A PIPE REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/10] | POLYESTER PROCESS USING A PIPE REACTOR | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUPO PETROTEMEX, S.A. DE C.V. Ricardo Margain No. 444 Torre sur, Piso 16 Col. Valle de Campestre San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon 66265 / MX | [2013/40] |
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Grupo Petrotemex, S.A. de C.V. Ricardo Margain No. 444 Torre sur, Piso 16 Col. Valle del Campestre 66265 San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon / MX | ||
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBRUIN, Bruce, Roger 321 Hedgerow Court Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Daniel, Lee 1032 Sheringham Court Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2012/11] | Tostmann, Holger Carl, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04753409.4 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004US16578 | Priority number, date | US20030456448 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 456448 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110616 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1631378 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631378 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, C08G63/78 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
B01J19/2435 (EP,US);
C08G63/78 (KR);
B01J19/24 (KR);
B01J19/243 (EP,US);
C08G63/785 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0011 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00184 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00254 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYESTER IN EINEM ROHRREAKTOR | [2019/44] | English: | POLYESTER PREPARATION PROCESS USING A PIPE REACTOR | [2019/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE POLYESTER METTANT EN OEUVRE UN REACTEUR TUBULAIRE | [2006/10] |
Former [2006/10] | POLYESTERVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ROHRREAKTORS | ||
Former [2006/10] | POLYESTER PROCESS USING A PIPE REACTOR | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2019 | 18.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2004 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | IE | 26.05.2020 | LU | 26.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 26.05.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0246266 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US], et al) [X] 1-72 * the whole document * * page 66, line 3 - page 68, line 6; figures 13a,13b *; | [X]US2002086969 (DEBRUIN BRUCE ROGER [US]) [X] 1-72 * the whole document * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0105]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2002137877 (DEBRUIN BRUCE ROGER [US]) [X] 1-72 * the whole document * * paragraph [0359] - paragraph [0374]; figures 13a,13b *; | [XP]US2004044170 (DEBRUIN BRUCE ROGER [US]) [XP] 1-72* the whole document * | Examination | WO0246267 |