EP1641551 - BROAD SPECTRUM FILTER SYSTEM INCLUDING TUNGSTEN-BASED IMPREGNANT AND BEING USEFUL FOR FILTERING CONTAMINANTS FROM AIR OR OTHER GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREY, Larry, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Simon, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
WEAGLE, Glenn, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04753569.5 | 27.05.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US16756 | Priority number, date | US20030606548 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: US 606548 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005005020 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1641551 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641551 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/38 (EP,US);
B01J20/0214 (EP,US);
B01J20/0218 (EP,US);
B01J20/0281 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/28052 (EP,US);
B01J20/3236 (EP,US);
B01J20/3255 (EP,US);
B01D2253/10 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/112 (EP,US);
B01D2257/406 (EP,US);
B01D2257/408 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | BREITSPEKTRUM-FILTERSYSTEM MIT IMPRÄGNIERMITTEL AUF BASIS VON WOLFRAM ZUR FILTRIERUNG VON VERUNREININGUNGEN AUS LUFT ODER AUS ANDEREN GASEN | [2006/14] | English: | BROAD SPECTRUM FILTER SYSTEM INCLUDING TUNGSTEN-BASED IMPREGNANT AND BEING USEFUL FOR FILTERING CONTAMINANTS FROM AIR OR OTHER GASES | [2006/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE FILTRATION A LARGE SPECTRE COMPRENANT UNE SUBSTANCE D'IMPREGNATION A BASE DE TUNGSTENE ET UTILE POUR FILTRER DES CONTAMINANTS DANS L'AIR OU AUTRES GAZ | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2013 | 05.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2004 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.05.2004 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 23.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US293962 (DEAN, N.C.) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [X]US2920051 (WIIG EDWIN O, et al) [X] 1-7,12-16,25,26 * column 2, line 10 - line 34 * * column 4, line 62 - line 66 *; | [A]EP0370141 (WESTVACO CORP [US]) [A] 1-36 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0405404 (CALGON CARBON CORP [US]) [X] 37,38* the whole document *; | [X]US5113856 (VAN DER SMISSEN CARL E [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11-16,24,25,27,29,32 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9310896 (CALGON CARBON CORP [US]) [A] 1-36 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5714126 (FRUND ZANE N [US]) [A] 1-36 * claim 1 * |