EP1631591 - CONNECTIVE TISSUE GROWTH FACTOR ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIBROGEN, INC. 409 Illinois Street San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states FIBROGEN, INC. 225 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Ai, Y. 7884 Pineville Circle Castro Valley, CA 94552 / US | 02 /
NEFF, Thomas, B. 190 Glenwood Avenue Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 03 /
OLIVER, Noelynn, A. 421 Mundel Way Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
USINGER, William, R. 1056 Roderick Court Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | 05 /
WANG, Qingjian 37 Edgewood Place Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 06 /
YEOWELL, David, A. 2432 Diamond Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04753822.8 | 02.06.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004US17080 | Priority number, date | US20030475598P | 04.06.2003 Original published format: US 475598 P | US20040858186 | 01.06.2004 Original published format: US 858186 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004108764 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1631591 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1631591 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/32 (EP);
C07K2317/35 (US);
C07K2317/41 (US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | 27.12.2005 | HR | 27.12.2005 | LT | 27.12.2005 | LV | 27.12.2005 | MK | 27.12.2005 | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CONNECTIVE TISSUE GROWTH FACTOR | [2006/10] | English: | CONNECTIVE TISSUE GROWTH FACTOR ANTIBODIES | [2006/10] | French: | ANTICORPS DIRIGES CONTRE LE FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DU TISSU CONJONCTIF | [2006/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Observations by third parties | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10184591.5 / EP2322549 | EP10184854.7 / EP2338914 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2004 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | FI | 02.06.2012 | LU | 02.06.2012 | ES | 03.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
FI | 02.06.2012 | ||
LU | 02.06.2012 | ||
ES | 03.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
FI | 02.06.2012 | ||
ES | 03.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
FI | 02.06.2012 | ||
ES | 03.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
FI | 02.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SI | 21.12.2011 | |
GR | 22.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9913910 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-26,29,51-79 * abstract *; | [XDI]WO0035936 (UNIV MIAMI [US], et al) [XD] 1-10,12-15,17-19,21,26,29,51-58,60-64,66-71,73-79 * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * * page 5, line 4 - line 5 * * page 26, line 7 - page 29, line 22 * * page 55, line 1 - page 56, line 14 * [I] 11,16,20,22-25,59; | [X]EP1043335 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-26,29,51-79 * page 41, paragraph 342 - paragraph 346 * * figure 2 *; | [PDA]WO03049773 (FIBROGEN INC [US], et al) [PDA] 1-90 * the whole document *; | [X] - DUNCAN M R ET AL, "CONNECTIVE TISSUE GROWTH FACTOR MEDIATES TRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTORBETA-INDUCED COLLAGEN SYNTHESIS: DOWN REGULATION BY CAMP", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (1999), vol. 13, no. 13, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 1774 - 1786, XP000916666 [X] 1-26,29,51-79 * the whole document * | [PX] - USINGER WILLIAM R ET AL, "TGFbeta2 binds CTGF specifically and is inhibited by a CTGF neutralizing antibody, FG-3019.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, & MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY RENAL WEEK; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; NOVEMBER 12-17, 2003, (200311), vol. 14, no. Abstracts Issue, ISSN 1046-6673, page 374A, XP009041082 [PX] 1-90 * abstract * | [PA] - LAM SUZANNE ET AL, "Connective tissue growth factor and IGF-I are produced by human renal fibroblasts and cooperate in the induction of collagen production by high glucose.", DIABETES, (200312), vol. 52, no. 12, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 2975 - 2983, XP002310287 [PA] 1-90 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.52.12.2975 | Examination | WO03024308 | other | WO03024308 |