EP1654589 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UPDATING AN IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE FROM A REMOTE LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2010/23] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Infocus Corporation 27700B SW Parkway Avenue Willsonville, OR 97070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTALDI, Joe 5380 Windsor Terrace West Linn, OR 97068 / US | 02 /
HOEYE, Robin, F. 25391 S. Hughes Lane Canby, OR 97013 / US | 03 /
FISHER, Karla P.O. Box 177 Gaston, OR 97119 / US | 04 /
KIM, Greg 18318 SW Florendo Lane Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 05 /
HAMPSON, Steve 17624 Schalit Way Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | 06 /
MICHALAK, Susan 4140 S.W. Greenhills Ways Portland, OR 97221 / US | 07 /
PORTER, Mark 15318 N.W. Energia Street Portland, OR 97229 / US | 08 /
THOMPSON, Kevin P.O. Box 4173 Salem, OR 97302 / US | 09 /
JAFFE, Jennifer 1411 S.E. 46th Avenue Portland, OR 97215 / US | 10 /
DAGLER, Leon 17258 S.W. Cobble Court Sherwood, OR 97140 / US | 11 /
CARVER, Sonia 7868 S. Grandview Avenue Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2007/14] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
CASTALDI, Joe 3114 Cottonwood Court West Linn, OR 97068 / US | ||
02 /
HOEYE, Robin, F. 10785 S.W. Summer Lake Drive Tigard, OR 97223 / US | |||
03 /
FISHER, Karla 2300 N.E. Ridge Road Gaston, OR 97119 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Greg 301 S.W. Lincoln Street 905 Portland, OR 97201 / US | |||
05 /
HAMPSON, Steve 17624 Schalit Way Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | |||
06 /
MICHALAK, Susan 4140 S.W. Greenhills Ways Portland, OR 97221 / US | |||
07 /
PORTER, Mark 15318 N.W. Energia Street Portland, OR 97229 / US | |||
08 /
THOMPSON, Kevin P.O. Box 4173 Salem, OR 97302 / US | |||
09 /
JAFFE, Jennifer 1411 S.E. 46th Avenue Portland, OR 97215 / US | |||
10 /
DAGLER, Leon 17258 S.W. Cobble Court Sherwood, OR 97140 / US | |||
11 /
CARVER, Sonia 40 Nova Court Lake Oswego, OR 97035 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Schweighart, Peter Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | Thoma, Michael, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04753971.3 | 01.06.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US17253 | Priority number, date | US20030474501P | 29.05.2003 Original published format: US 474501 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004109453 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1654589 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/26, G06F3/14 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP);
G09B5/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/29] | G03B21/00, G03B21/26, H04N9/31 | ||
Former IPC [2006/19] | G03B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AKTUALISIEREN EINER BILDANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG VON EINEM FERNEN ORT AUS | [2006/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UPDATING AN IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE FROM A REMOTE LOCATION | [2006/19] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MISE A JOUR D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES DEPUIS UN EMPLACEMENT DISTANT | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 06.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6388654 (PLATZKER DANIEL M [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract ** column 11, line 41 - line 57 * | International search | [A]US6522352 (STRANDWITZ PETER [US], et al) | Examination | WO9603734 | EP1227677 |