|
15.03.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
44 |