Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006017017 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2006 | A3 | WO2006017017 | 16.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US88703004 | 07.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005002194 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2005 | A3 | WO2005002194 | 06.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004109384 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2005 | A3 | WO2004109384 | 16.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03058341 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013159571 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5913805 | 15.02.2005 | US88703004 | 07.07.2004 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | US201313770141 | 19.02.2013 | US67036107 | 01.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8402185 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2013 | B2 | US2007130402 | 07.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5913805 | 15.02.2005 | US88703004 | 07.07.2004 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | US67036107 | 01.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7140731 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2006 | B2 | US2006146291 | 06.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US37779606 | 15.03.2006 | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7118220 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2006 | B2 | US2006050240 | 09.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26372205 | 31.10.2005 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | US85867004 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006010291 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88703004 | 07.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7182462 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2007 | B2 | US2006007400 | 12.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | US85869304 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7350923 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2008 | B2 | US2005140928 | 30.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5913805 | 15.02.2005 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7018043 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2006 | B2 | US2005110953 | 26.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | US85867004 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7044605 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2006 | B2 | US2005105055 | 19.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7055956 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2006 | B2 | US2005007565 | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91632504 | 10.08.2004 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6860609 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2005 | B2 | US2004041989 | 04.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20040070284 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0240725 | 19.12.2002 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4692487B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2007516506 | 21.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | WO2004US17252 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4139777B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2008 | B2 | JP2005514691 | 19.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0240725 | 19.12.2002 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1649321 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2007 | A4 | EP1649321 | 26.04.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | WO2004US17420 | 02.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1636647 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | A4 | EP1636647 | 22.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | WO2004US17252 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1631861 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | B1 | EP1631861 | 17.12.2008 | A4 | EP1631861 | 08.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US17347 | 02.06.2004 | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1468329 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2007 | A4 | EP1468329 | 20.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0240725 | 19.12.2002 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002364081 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0240725 | 19.12.2002 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1654589 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | A4 | EP1654589 | 10.05.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | WO2004US17253 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE535842T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US17347 | 02.06.2004 | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0215309 | 21.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0240725 | 19.12.2002 | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100517058C | 22.07.2009 | C | CN1833202 | 13.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100520558C | 29.07.2009 | C | CN1608229 | 20.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100594420C | 17.03.2010 | C | CN1833196 | 13.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | WO2004US17420 | 02.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100594423C | 17.03.2010 | C | CN1829942 | 06.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | WO2004US17252 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1829941B | 09.03.2011 | B | CN1829941 | 06.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | WO2004US17253 | 01.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI344575B | 01.07.2011 | B | TW200508777 | 01.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US45390503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200525414 | 01.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US45386503 | 02.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6830340 | 14.12.2004 | B2 | US2003117587 | 26.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3347401 | 26.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004111769 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2005 | A3 | WO2004111769 | 23.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004109453 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2005 | A3 | WO2004109453 | 16.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011210256 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5278422B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B2 | JP2011170837 | 01.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010287222 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101763235 | 30.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102591607B | 26.11.2014 | B | CN102591607 | 18.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US47450103 | 29.05.2003 |