EP1633236 - DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA AND OTHER SURGICAL PROCEDURES AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SUCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/11] | DEVICE AND METHODS USEABLE FOR TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA AND OTHER SURGICAL PROCEDURES | ||
[2012/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOMEDIX CORPORATION 27452 Calle Arroyo San Juan Capistrano, California 92675 / US | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTELSTEIN, Michael 29412 Clipper Way Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | 02 /
SORENSEN, John, T. 19 Barnstable Way Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US | 03 /
MIRHASHEMI, Soheila 29412 Clipper Way Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | 04 /
GERG, James, B. 24725 Woodhill Lane Lake Forest, California 92630 / US | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Maughan, Sophie Louise, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Maughan, Sophie Louise, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/11] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Marks & Clerk 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04754920.9 | 10.06.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004US18483 | Priority number, date | US20030477258P | 10.06.2003 Original published format: US 477258 P | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004110260 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1633236 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633236 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007, A61F9/008, A61B17/3201, A61B17/3205, A61B18/04, A61B18/08, A61B18/12, A61B18/18, A61B18/20 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61B18/1482 (EP,US);
A61F9/00781 (US);
A61B18/1402 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2018/00083 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00601 (US);
A61B2018/00964 (US);
A61B2018/1497 (EP,US);
A61B2218/002 (US);
A61B2218/007 (US);
A61F9/007 (EP,US);
A61F9/0079 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GLAUKOM UND ANDERE CHIRURGISCHE EINGRIFFE UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2012/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA AND OTHER SURGICAL PROCEDURES AND METHOD OF PRODUCING SUCH DEVICE | [2012/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU GLAUCOME ET AUTRES PROCEDURES CHIRURGICALES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SA FABRICATION | [2012/40] |
Former [2006/11] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GLAUKOM UND ANDERE CHIRURGISCHE EINGRIFFE | ||
Former [2006/11] | DEVICE AND METHODS USEABLE FOR TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA AND OTHER SURGICAL PROCEDURES | ||
Former [2006/11] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU GLAUCOME ET AUTRES PROCEDURES CHIRURGICALES | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 29.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2004 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | LU | 10.06.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | SI | 10.04.2013 | |
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5755716 (GARITO JON C [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * column 1, lines 5-9,51-58 * * column 2, lines 16-55 * * column 3, lines 15-45; figures 2,3,4A; claim 1 * [A] 5,12; | [XA]WO02056805 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0093] , [0098] , [0099] , [0168]; figures 7,8,35A/B; claims 36,37 *[A] 6 | International search | [X]US3294085 (WALLACE FREDERICK J); | [X]US5431646 (VASSILIADIS ARTHUR [US], et al); | [X]US5957914 (COOK KENNETH PRICE [US], et al); | [X]US2002111608 (BAERVELDT GEORGE [US], et al) |