EP1635825 - SYNERGISTIC COMBINATIONS INCLUDING N-ACYLATED 4-HYDROXYPHENYLAMINE DERIVATIVES AND CAFFEINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College 3810 Lakeshore Drive System Building, Suite 115 Baton Rouge, Louisiana 70808 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states The Foundation for the LSU Health Sciences Center 2000 Tulane Avenue New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAZAN, Nicolas, G. 478 Broadway Street New Orleans, LA 70118 / US | 02 /
SUNKEL, Carlos Calle Amara 47 E-28033 Madrid / ES | 03 /
BUILLA, Julio, Alvarez C. Condado de Treoino a E-28033 Madrid / ES | 04 /
PAUL, Dennis 836 Louisiana Avenue New Orleans, LA 70115 / US | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Gregory, Robert John H. WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Gregory, Robert John H. W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/12] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 04754946.4 | 10.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004US18514 | Priority number, date | US20030459911 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: US 459911 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004110440 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635825 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635825 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/428, A61K31/485, A61P25/04, A61K31/522 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/425, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/428, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN ENTHALTEND N-ACYLIERTE 4-HYDROXYPHENYLAMIN DERIVATE UND KOFFEIN | [2006/12] | English: | SYNERGISTIC COMBINATIONS INCLUDING N-ACYLATED 4-HYDROXYPHENYLAMINE DERIVATIVES AND CAFFEINE | [2006/12] | French: | COMBINAISONS SYNERGIQUES CONTENANT DES DERIVES DE 4- HYDROXYPHENYLAMINES N-ACYLEES ET DE LA CAFEINE | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/12] | COMBINAISONS SYNERGIQUES CONTENANT DES DERIVES DE 4- HYDROXYPHENYLAMINES N-ACYLEES ET CAFEINE | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 08.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.2008 | BE | 01.10.2008 | CY | 01.10.2008 | CZ | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | PL | 01.10.2008 | RO | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | HU | 02.04.2009 | IE | 10.06.2009 | LU | 10.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
IE | 10.06.2009 | ||
LU | 10.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.06.2009 | ||
LU | 10.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
PL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9632940 (LSU MEDICAL CENTER FOUNDATION [US]) [YD] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2004043460 (LSU MEDICAL CT FOUNDATION [US]) [PY] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [Y] - VIGNON E ET AL, Multicenter, double-blind, clinical trial comparing two tablets bid to one tablet qid of the same acetaminophen-dextropropoxyphen-caffeine combination in patients with osteoarthritis, SEMAINE DES HOPITAUX, VOL. 75, NR. 13-14, PAGE(S) 419-425, (19990415), ISSN 0037-1777, XP009037373 [Y] 1,14,15,25,38,39 * abstract * | [Y] - ENGELHARDT GUENTHER ET AL, "Role of caffeine in combined analgesic drugs from the point of view of experimental pharmacology", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG, (1997), vol. 47, no. 8, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 917 - 927, XP001183579 [Y] 16,40 * abstract * * page 926, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - TRUTER ILSE, "An investigation into compound analgesic prescribing in South Africa, with special emphasis on meprobamate-containing analgesics", PHARMACOEPIDEMIOLOGY AND DRUG SAFETY, (199803), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1053-8569, pages 91 - 97, XP009037383 [Y] 1-3,25-27 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1557(199803/04)7:2<91::AID-PDS331>3.3.CO;2-B | [Y] - GOLDSTEIN JEROME, "Caffeine as an analgesic adjuvant", INFLAMMOPHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 9, no. 1-2, ISSN 0925-4692, pages 51 - 61, XP009037382 [Y] 1-48 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1163/156856001300248326 | [YD] - ZHANG W Y, "A benefit-risk assessment of caffeine as an analgesic adjuvant.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (2001), Database accession no. NLM11772146, XP002298698 [YD] 1-48 * abstract * | [ ] - DRUG SAFETY : AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MEDICAL TOXICOLOGY AND DRUG EXPERIENCE. 2001, (2001), vol. 24, no. 15, ISSN 0114-5916, pages 1127 - 1142 |