EP1645142 - FAST HANDOVER THROUGH PROACTIVE REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60096 / US | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORENBOSCH, Jheroen P. 594 CR, 3585 Paradise, TX 76073 / US | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB | Application number, filing date | 04755284.9 | 16.06.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004US19007 | Priority number, date | US20030610500 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 610500 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005006571 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1645142 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645142 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/14 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
H04W36/1446 (EP,US);
H04W60/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/51] | H04Q7/00, H04Q7/38 | ||
Former IPC [2006/15] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLE WEITERREICHUNG DURCH PROAKTIVE REGISTRATION | [2006/15] | English: | FAST HANDOVER THROUGH PROACTIVE REGISTRATION | [2006/15] | French: | TRANSFERT RAPIDE PAR ENREGISTREMENT PROACTIF | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.02.2010 | BE | 10.02.2010 | CY | 10.02.2010 | CZ | 10.02.2010 | DK | 10.02.2010 | EE | 10.02.2010 | FI | 10.02.2010 | IT | 10.02.2010 | NL | 10.02.2010 | PL | 10.02.2010 | RO | 10.02.2010 | SE | 10.02.2010 | SI | 10.02.2010 | SK | 10.02.2010 | TR | 10.02.2010 | BG | 10.05.2010 | GR | 11.05.2010 | PT | 11.06.2010 | IE | 16.06.2010 | LU | 16.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 11.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 16.06.2010 | ||
LU | 16.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 11.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 11.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 16.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
IE | 16.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
BE | 10.02.2010 | ||
CY | 10.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SE | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 10.02.2010 | |
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 10.02.2010 | |
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | PT | 11.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002085516 (BRIDGELALL RAJ [US]); | [X]US2003104814 (GWON YOUNGJUNE L [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2002085516 (BRIDGELALL RAJ [US]) | by applicant | US2002085516 | US2003104814 |