EP1768920 - CONVEYOR PASSENGER INTERFACE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY Ten Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANSEVERO, Frank 34 Cardinal Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
BAHJAT, Zuhair, S. P.O. Box 634 New Britain, CT 06050 / US | 03 /
TERRY, Harry 73 Deepwood Drive Avon, CT 06001 / US | 04 /
PULLING, Richard, K. 39 Sheffield Lane Avon, CT 06001 / US | 05 /
STILLION, Daniel, James 750 Kings Mountain Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 06 /
SCHREIBER, Kate, M. 36 Highland Avenue Cambridge, MA 01239 / US | 07 /
DRAUDT, Gregg, Robert 138 Crescent Street Stom, MA 01775 / US | 08 /
JUDSON, Jared, Alden 114 South Main Street Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/41] | 01 /
SANSEVERO, Frank 34 Cardinal Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | ||
02 /
BAHJAT, Zuhair, S. 85 South Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | |||
03 /
TERRY, Harry 73 Deepwood Drive Avon, CT 06001 / US | |||
04 /
PULLING, Richard, K. 39 Sheffield Lane Avon, CT 06001 / US | |||
05 /
STILLION, Daniel, James 750 Kings Mountain Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | |||
06 /
SCHREIBER, Kate, M. 36 Highland Avenue Cambridge, MA 01239 / US | |||
07 /
DRAUDT, Gregg, Robert 138 Crescent Street Stom, MA 01775 / US | |||
08 /
JUDSON, Jared, Alden 114 South Main Street Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | |||
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
* * * | |||
04 /
* * * | |||
05 /
* * * | |||
06 /
* * * | |||
07 /
* * * | |||
08 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04755310.2 | 11.06.2004 | [2007/14] | WO2004US19051 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006001804 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1768920 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768920 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34, B66B1/46, B66B3/02 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
B66B3/02 (EP,US);
B66B1/46 (EP,US);
B66B1/468 (EP,US);
B66B2201/4615 (EP,US);
B66B2201/4638 (EP,US);
B66B2201/4646 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | B66B1/34 | ||
Former IPC [2007/14] | B65G41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | FÖRDEREINRICHTUNG-PERSONEN-SCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM | [2007/14] | English: | CONVEYOR PASSENGER INTERFACE SYSTEM | [2007/14] | French: | SYSTEME D'INTERFACE POUR PASSAGER DE DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2004 | AT | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | MC | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | IE | 11.06.2013 | LU | 11.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 10.10.2012 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2237410 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,11-13 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 34 * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 1 * * figures 2, 3 * [I] 8,10,14; | [XI]US5952626 (ZAHARIA VLAD [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9,11,13 * column 2, line 25 - line 28 * * column 3, line 6 - line 9 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 28 * * figures 1-5,9,10 *[I] 8,10,12,14 | International search | [X]US6801792 (SCHUSTER KILIAN [CH], et al); | [Y]US2001035314 (YOSHIDA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US5255341 (NAKAJIMA YUTAKA [JP]); | [X]US6223160 (KOSTKA MIROSLAV [CH], et al) |