15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
30.05.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
06.12.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
21.06.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.02.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2011 |
First examination report |
|
26.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
01.09.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
17.02.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|