EP1639660 - EFFICIENT MICRO FUEL CELL SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultracell Corporation 399 Lindbergh Avenue Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYE, Ian, W. 1307 Chateau Common Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 02 /
TUCKER, Gerry 4206 Dundalk Court Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2007/02] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Browne, Robin Forsythe HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | Browne, Robin Forsythe Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04756161.8 | 25.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US20517 | Priority number, date | US20030482981P | 27.06.2003 Original published format: US 482981 P | US20030483416P | 27.06.2003 Original published format: US 483416 P | US20030482996P | 27.06.2003 Original published format: US 482996 P | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005004257 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1639660 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
H01M8/04225 (EP,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01J19/249 (EP,US);
B01J8/0221 (EP,US);
B01J8/0242 (EP,US);
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
B01J8/0438 (EP,US);
B01J8/0484 (EP,US);
C01B3/323 (EP,US);
C01B3/38 (EP,US);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (EP);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M8/04037 (EP,US);
H01M8/04067 (EP,US);
H01M8/04298 (EP,US);
H01M8/0435 (EP,US);
H01M8/04365 (EP,US);
H01M8/04373 (EP,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP,US);
H01M8/04425 (EP,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04589 (EP,US);
H01M8/04604 (EP,US);
H01M8/04619 (EP,US);
H01M8/04626 (EP,US);
H01M8/04731 (EP,US);
H01M8/04738 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04768 (EP,US);
H01M8/04776 (EP,US);
H01M8/04955 (EP,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
H01M8/0631 (EP,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP);
B01J2208/00061 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00309 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00398 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00407 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00415 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00504 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00646 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00716 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00783 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00835 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00873 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00907 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2453 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2458 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2459 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2462 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2465 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2467 (EP,US);
B01J2219/247 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2475 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2479 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2481 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2482 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0244 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0805 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0822 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0827 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0844 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0866 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1223 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1247 (EP,US);
C01B2203/142 (EP,US);
C01B2203/82 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M8/04268 (EP,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | H01M2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE MIKRO-BRENNSTOFFZELLEN-SYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2006/13] | English: | EFFICIENT MICRO FUEL CELL SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2006/13] | French: | SYSTEMES EFFICACES DE MICROPILES A COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6266578 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-4,42,43 * abstract *; | [X]US4686157 (MIYAKE YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9-12,14,42,43 * column 5, lines 30-48; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH02139871 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3,4,42 * abstract *; | [X]DE4446841 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,9,10,42-45 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 16; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2002071972 (GEBHARDT ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,42-45 * paragraphs [0010] - [0030] * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2003082423 (KUSHIBIKI KEIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 7* paragraph [0052] * | International search | [X]US2002071972 (GEBHARDT ULRICH [DE], et al); | [Y]US2003082423 (KUSHIBIKI KEIKO [JP], et al); | [YP]US2003235732 (HALTINER KARL J [US]) |