EP1638768 - TAMPER EVIDENT FLOW WRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonoco Development, Inc. North Second Street Hartsville, SC 29550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Sonoco Development, Inc. North Second Street Hartsville South Carolina 29550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUFFER, Scott, W. 1216 Oakhaven Circle Hartsville, SC 29550 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | McNally, Roisin Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04756425.7 | 30.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004US21007 | Priority number, date | US20030484368P | 02.07.2003 Original published format: US 484368 P | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005005141 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638768 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B65D65/40, B65D33/34 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B3/26 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B65D65/16 (EP,US);
B65D65/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/514 (US);
B32B2307/582 (US);
B32B2307/5825 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
C09J2203/338 (EP,US);
C09J2301/162 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/915 (EP,US);
Y10S428/916 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖFFNUNGSICHERER SCHLAUCHBEUTEL | [2006/13] | English: | TAMPER EVIDENT FLOW WRAP | [2006/13] | French: | EMBALLAGE TUBULAIRE INVIOLABLE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/08] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0403161 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1,4,5,7,16-19 * * page 2, line 38 - line 53 * * page 3, line 16 - line 58 * * page 4, line 16 - line 39 * * page 5, line 4 - line 25 *; | [Y]EP1231052 (SONOCO DEV INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1,2,4,8,10,11,13,18 * * page 1, paragraphs 1,2,5-9 * * page 3, paragraphs 15,16 ** page 4, paragraphs 23,25 * |