EP1761746 - Coriolis flowmeter with split balance weights for eliminating density effect on measured flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/11] | SPLIT BALANCE WEIGHTS FOR ELIMINATING DENSITY EFFECT ON FLOW | ||
[2010/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Motion, Inc. 7070 Winchester Circle Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2007/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN CLEVE, Craig, Brainerd 2921 Stagecoach Trail P.O. Box 1382 Lyons, Colorado 80540 / US | 02 /
BELL, Mark, James 11787 N. Beasly Road Longmont, Colorado 80504 / US | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
VAN CLEVE, Craig, Brainerd 2921 Stagecoach Trail P.O. Box 1382 Lyons, Colorado 80540 / US | ||
02 /
BELL, Mark, James 15710 West 66th Place Arvada, Colorado 80007 / US | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park, Bidford on Avon Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park Bidford on Avon Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/16] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen Henley-in-Arden B95 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Holmes, Matthew William, et al Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen Warwickshire, B95 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Lane, Michael John, et al Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm Wootton Wawen Warwickshire B95 6HJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Bibby, William Mark, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge, Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04756580.9 | 01.07.2004 | [2007/11] | WO2004US21318 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006014153 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1761746 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1761746 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/84 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
G01F15/024 (EP,US);
G01F1/84 (KR);
G01F1/8418 (EP,US);
G01F1/8422 (EP,US);
G01F1/8477 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Coriolis Durchflussmessgerät mit aufgeteilten Auswucht-Gewichten zur Beseitigung des Dichteeffekts auf gemessene Durchflüsse | [2010/46] | English: | Coriolis flowmeter with split balance weights for eliminating density effect on measured flow | [2010/46] | French: | Débitmètre de Coriolis avec poids d'équilibrage partagés pour éliminer l'effet de la densité sur le débit mesuré | [2010/46] |
Former [2007/11] | AUFGETEILTE BALANCE-GEWICHTE ZUR BESEITIGUNG DES DICHTEEFFEKTS AUF STRÖMUNGEN | ||
Former [2007/11] | SPLIT BALANCE WEIGHTS FOR ELIMINATING DENSITY EFFECT ON FLOW | ||
Former [2007/11] | POIDS D'ÉQUILIBRE PARTAGÉS POUR ÉLIMINER L'EFFET DE DENSITÉ SUR LE FLUX | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.2011 | BE | 20.04.2011 | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | HU | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SE | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | IE | 01.07.2011 | LU | 01.07.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
LU | 01.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
LU | 01.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
LU | 01.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
BE | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 22.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPS58178218 ; | [XI]US4831885 (DAHLIN ERIK B [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,13,17,18,21-23,29 * column 6, line 27 - line 32 * * column 13 - column 14 * * column 15, line 54 - line 55 * * column 17 - column 18 * * column 24, line 25 - line 38 * * figures 1,3a,3b,7a,7b,10c * [I] 8-12,14-16,24-28,30-32; | [A]US5054326 (MATTAR WADE M [US]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 60 *; | [A]EP1248084 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0021] , [0027] , [0030] , [0034] - [0037] *; | [A]US2002174730 (DRAHM WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * paragraphs [0068] , [0076] , [0078] *; | [A]EP1431719 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-32 * abstract *; | [E]WO2004099735 (MICRO MOTION INC [US], et al) [E] 1-32* the whole document * | [XI] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840126), vol. 008, no. 018, & JP58178218 A 19831019 (YOKOGAWA HOKUSHIN ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6,13,17,18,20,22,29 * column A; figures 1-5 * [I] 3,5,7-12,14-16,19,21,23-28,30-32 |