EP1642206 - REPROGRAMMABLE SECURITY FOR CONTROLLING PIRACY AND ENABLING INTERACTIVE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irdeto B.V. Taurusavenue 105 2130 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [2015/21] |
Former [2013/47] | For all designated states Irdeto USA, Inc. 3255-3 Scott Blvd., Suite 101 Santa Clara CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Rovi Solutions Corporation 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states MACROVISION CORPORATION 1830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Cryptography Research Inc. 575 Market Street, 11th Floor San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Cryptography Research Inc. 575 Market Street, Suite 2150 San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCHER, Paul, C.@c/o Cryptography Research, Inc. 11th Floor, 575 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | 02 /
JAFFE, Joshua, M. 1833 Church Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
JUN, Benjamin, C. 133 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 04 /
LAREN, Carter, C. 86 Barcelona Avenue San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | 05 /
PEARSON, Peter, K. 5624 Victoria Lane Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 06 /
LAWSON, Nathaniel J. 1704 Pleasant Valley Avenue 2 Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2017/51] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
KOCHER, Paul, C. c/o Cryptography Research, Inc. 11th Floor, 575 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | ||
02 /
JAFFE, Joshua, M. 1833 Church Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
03 /
JUN, Benjamin, C. 133 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
04 /
LAREN, Carter, C. 86 Barcelona Avenue San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | |||
05 /
PEARSON, Peter, K. 5624 Victoria Lane Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
06 /
LAWSON, Nathaniel J. 1704 Pleasant Valley Avenue 2 Oakland, CA 94611 / US | |||
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
KOCHER, Paul, C. c/o Cryptography Research, Inc. 21st Floor, 575 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | ||
02 /
JAFFE, Joshua, M. 1833 Church Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
03 /
JUN, Benjamin, C. 133 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
04 /
LAREN, Carter, C. 86 Barcelona Avenue San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | |||
05 /
PEARSON, Peter, K. 5624 Victoria Lane Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
06 /
LAWSON, Nathaniel J. 1704 Pleasant Valley Avenue 2 Oakland, CA 94611 / US | |||
Former [2006/27] | 01 /
KOCHER, Paul, C. c/o Cryptography Research, Inc. 21st Floor, 575 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | ||
02 /
JAFFE, Joshua, M. 1833 Church Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
03 /
JUN, Benjamin, C. 133 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
04 /
LAREN, Carter, C. 86 Barcelona Avenue San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | |||
05 /
PEARSON, Peter, K. 5624 Victoria Lane Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
Former [2006/14] | 01 /
KOCHER, Paul, C. 134 Fillmore Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | ||
02 /
JAFFE, Joshua, M. 1833 Church Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
03 /
JUN, Benjamin, C. 133 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
04 /
LAREN, Carter, C. 86 Barcelona Avenue San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | |||
05 /
PEARSON, Peter, K. 5624 Victoria Lane Livermore, CA 94550 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/11] | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/05] | Pelly, Jason Charles, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04756690.6 | 07.07.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US21621 | Priority number, date | US20030614765 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: US 614765 | US20040537421P | 16.01.2004 Original published format: US 537421 P | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005008385 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1642206 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642206 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/14, G06Q50/18, H04L9/08, H04L9/30, H04L9/32, G11B20/00, G06F21/10, H04N21/426, H04N21/432, H04N21/4627, H04N5/913, H04N21/418, H04N21/4405, H04N21/8358, G06F9/445, H04N21/81 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F12/14 (KR);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06F9/445 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00115 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00231 (EP,US);
G11B20/00246 (EP,US);
G11B20/00253 (EP,US);
G11B20/00449 (EP,US);
G11B20/00818 (EP,US);
G11B20/00884 (EP,US);
H04L9/0844 (EP,US);
H04L9/302 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/3249 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/8193 (EP,US);
H04N21/8358 (EP,US);
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
H04N2005/91342 (EP,US);
H04N2005/91364 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | G06F12/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 05.01.2006 | HR | 05.01.2006 | LT | 05.01.2006 | LV | 05.01.2006 | MK | 05.01.2006 | Title | German: | UMPROGRAMMIERBARE SICHERHEIT ZUR KONTROLLE VON WIDERRECHTLICHEN KOPIEN UND ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG EINES INTERAKTIVEN INHALTS | [2006/14] | English: | REPROGRAMMABLE SECURITY FOR CONTROLLING PIRACY AND ENABLING INTERACTIVE CONTENT | [2006/14] | French: | SECURITE REPROGRAMMABLE POUR LUTTER CONTRE LE PIRATAGE ET AUTORISER L'ACCES A DU CONTENU INTERACTIF | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12172640.0 / EP2557521 | EP12172641.8 / EP2570918 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/44] |
Former [2009/20] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 26.02.2009 | ||
[2014/44] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2004 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | GB | 07.07.2018 | IE | 07.07.2018 | LU | 07.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5802592 (CHESS DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 16 ** column 5, line 29 - line 58 * | International search | [A]US5191611 (LANG GERALD S [US]); | [A]US5392351 (HASEBE TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5450489 (OSTROVER LEWIS S [US], et al); | [A]US5638443 (STEFIK MARK J [US], et al); | [X]US6314409 (SCHNECK PAUL B [US], et al) |