EP1682457 - METHODS OF MAKING ALUMINA-SILICA GLASSES OR GLASS-CERAMICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDRES, Berkan, K. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Thomas, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04756711.0 | 06.07.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004US21689 | Priority number, date | US20030655729 | 05.09.2003 Original published format: US 655729 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026069 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682457 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/062, C03C10/00, C03C12/00, C03B11/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
C03C3/062 (EP,KR,US);
C03B19/01 (EP,US);
C03B19/06 (KR);
C03B19/063 (EP,US);
C03B19/10 (KR);
C03B19/102 (EP,US);
C03B19/1095 (EP,US);
C03B32/02 (EP,KR,US);
C03C10/00 (EP,US);
C03C12/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/44 (EP,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,US);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
C04B35/62625 (EP,US);
C04B35/62665 (EP,US);
C09K3/1427 (EP,US);
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
C23C4/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/11 (EP,US);
C23C4/123 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3222 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/402 (EP,US);
C04B2235/441 (EP,US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,US);
C04B2235/483 (EP,US);
C04B2235/528 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALIMINIUMOXID-SILICIUMOXID-GLÄSERN ODER GLASKERAMIKEN | [2006/46] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING ALUMINA-SILICA GLASSES OR GLASS-CERAMICS | [2006/30] | French: | PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE VERRES OU DE VITROCERAMIQUES EN ALUMINE-SILICE | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/30] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALIMINIUMOXID-SILICIUMOXID-GLÄSERN ODER GLASKERAMIKEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 04.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2004071976 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [E] 1-3,6-48 * page 8, line 20 - line 22; claim - *; | [X]WO03011782 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6-49 * page 15, line 16 - page 16, line 3; example 31; claim - *; | [A]US6254981 (CASTLE RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-49 * claim - * |