EP1665341 - AN IMAGER PHOTO DIODE CAPACITOR STRUCTURE WITH REDUCED PROCESS VARIATION SENSITIVITY AND ITS METHOD OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/23] | AN IMAGER PHOTO DIODE CAPACITOR STRUCTURE WITH REDUCED PROCESS VARIATION SENSITIVITY | ||
[2010/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptina Imaging Corporation c/o Citco Trustees (Cayman) Limited Regatta Office Park West Bay Road Grand Cayman, Y1-1205 / KY | [2010/14] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCLURE, Brent, A. 3315 Raindrop Drive Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04757391.0 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US24598 | Priority number, date | US20030635580 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: US 635580 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017982 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1665341 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1665341 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/146 (KR);
H04N25/59 (EP,US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,US);
H01L27/14689 (EP,US);
H01L27/148 (EP,US);
H04N25/771 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/11] | H01L27/146, H01L27/148 | ||
Former IPC [2006/23] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBER-FOTODIODEN-KONDENSATORSTRUKTUR MIT VERRINGERTER PROZESSSCHWANKUNGSEMPFINDLICHKEIT UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/15] | English: | AN IMAGER PHOTO DIODE CAPACITOR STRUCTURE WITH REDUCED PROCESS VARIATION SENSITIVITY AND ITS METHOD OF FABRICATION | [2010/15] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONDENSATEURS A PHOTODIODE D'IMAGEUR AVEC SENSIBILITE REDUITE DE VARIATION DE PROCESSUS ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2010/16] |
Former [2006/23] | BILDGEBER-FOTODIODEN-KONDENSATORSTRUKTUR MIT VERRINGERTER PROZESSSCHWANKUNGSEMPFINDLICHKEIT | ||
Former [2006/23] | AN IMAGER PHOTO DIODE CAPACITOR STRUCTURE WITH REDUCED PROCESS VARIATION SENSITIVITY | ||
Former [2006/23] | STRUCTURE DE CONDENSATEURS A PHOTODIODE D'IMAGEUR AVEC SENSIBILITE DE VARIATION DE PROCESSUS | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | IE | 30.07.2011 | LU | 30.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | FR | 01.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 30.07.2011 | ||
LU | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 30.07.2011 | ||
LU | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 30.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 16.03.2011 | |
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002117690 (RHODES HOWARD E [US]); | [X]US6489619 (STREET ROBERT A [US]); | [X]EP1333661 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [GB]); | [E]EP1574042 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [E]EP1636983 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) | International search | [A]US6489619 (STREET ROBERT A [US]); | [A]US2003164443 (HENDERSON ROBERT [GB]) |