EP1670638 - PRINTABLE INSULATING COMPOSITIONS AND PRINTABLE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOSS-KEHL, Jessica L. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BRADY, John T. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, D. Scott Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MA 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
NERAD, Bruce A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
BOTTARI, Frank J. 300 Griffin Brook Park Drive Methuen, MA 01844 / US | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04757410.8 | 02.08.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004US24890 | Priority number, date | US20030674999 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 674999 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005035238 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670638 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/04, C08L83/04, B41J2/01 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B9/04 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/00 (KR);
C08K2201/011 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKBARE ISOLIERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND BEDRUCKBARE ARTIKEL | [2006/25] | English: | PRINTABLE INSULATING COMPOSITIONS AND PRINTABLE ARTICLES | [2006/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ISOLANTES IMPRIMABLES ET ARTICLES IMPRIMABLES | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 10.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XE]US2004163570 (VANMAELE LUC [BE], et al); | [X]US6586104 (MATSUDA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US4894254 (NAKAYAMA MUNEO [JP], et al) |