EP1608320 - NOVEL IMIDAZOLINE RECEPTOR HOMOLOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000, Route 206 and Provinceline Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDER, John, N. 277 Dutchtown Zion Road Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
KINNEY, Gene, G. 4125 Justin Ct. Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
MINTIER, Gabriel 318 Morrison Avenue Hightstown, NJ 08520 / US | 04 /
RAMANATHAN, Chandra, S. 41 Alison Avenue Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | 05 /
BOL, David, K. 8904 Brink Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20882 / US | 06 /
RYSECK, Rolf-Peter 48 Brophy Drive Ewing, NJ 08638 / US | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04757780.4 | 16.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004US08207 | Priority number, date | US20030395812 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: US 395812 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004084810 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608320 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06, C07K14/705, C12N15/11 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | C12P21/06 | ||
Former IPC [2005/52] | A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | 14.09.2005 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | 14.09.2005 | MK | 14.09.2005 | Title | German: | NEUE IMIDAZOLIN-REZEPTOR-HOMOLOGE | [2005/52] | English: | NOVEL IMIDAZOLINE RECEPTOR HOMOLOGS | [2005/52] | French: | NOUVEAUX HOMOLOGUES DES RECEPTEURS DE L'IMIDAZOLINE | [2005/52] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0216585 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 1-14,18,19* the whole document *; | [X]WO0224750 (AEOMICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14,18,19 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - SMITH D.P. ET AL., "LIP1, a cytoplasmic protein functionally linked to the Peutz-Jeghers Syndrome kinase LKB1", HUM. MOL. GENET., (200112), vol. 10, no. 25, pages 2869 - 2877, XP002272019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/10.25.2869 |