Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7980289 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2011 | B2 | US2007088430 | 19.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80339204 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | US54949306 | 13.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7122049 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2006 | B2 | US2004186554 | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80339204 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5021298B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2012 | B2 | JP2006520648 | 14.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2289464 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B1 | EP2289464 | 02.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | EP04757798 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004224415B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2011 | B2 | AU2004224415 | 07.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1610724 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | B1 | EP1610724 | 13.06.2007 | A4 | EP1610724 | 04.01.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE492246T | 15.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2519226 | 15.01.2013 | C | CA2519226 | 07.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004030671D1 | 03.02.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05009823 | 13.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US08247 | 18.03.2004 | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004084764 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2005 | A3 | WO2004084764 | 07.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100558320C | 11.11.2009 | C | CN1787793 | 14.06.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US45578303 | 19.03.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2289464 |