EP1605844 - SPINAL FIXATION DEVICES OF IMPROVED STRENGTH AND RIGIDITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Spine Sàrl Chemin-Blanc 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | [2008/44] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Depuy Acromed SARL Chemin-Blanc 36 2400 Le Locle / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COURNOYER, John, R. 25 King Street Norfolk, MA 02056 / US | 02 /
VARIEUR, Michael, S. 46 Greystone Terrace Portsmouth, RI 02871 / US | 03 /
RUIZ, P., Alan 12 Noonan Street Mansfield, MA 02038 / US | 04 /
CARLONE, Anthony, R. 7 Naomi Street Bristol, RI 02809 / US | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
COURNOYER, John, R. 25 King Street Norfolk, MA 02056 / US | ||
02 /
VARIEUR, Michael, S. 263 Rhode Island Boulevard Portsmouth, RI 02871 / US | |||
03 /
RUIZ, P., Alan 12 Noonan Street Mansfield, MA 02038 / US | |||
04 /
CARLONE, Anthony, R. 7 Naomi Street Bristol, RI 02809 / US | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Orr, Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2005/51] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04757845.5 | 19.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US08374 | Priority number, date | US20030393575 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: US 393575 | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004084744 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605844 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/7041 (EP,US);
A61F2/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRBELSÄULENFIXATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER STÄRKE UND STARRHEIT | [2005/51] | English: | SPINAL FIXATION DEVICES OF IMPROVED STRENGTH AND RIGIDITY | [2005/51] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE FIXATION RACHIDIENS DE MEILLEURES RESISTANCE ET RIGIDITE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5817094 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-15,26,35,45 * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 22 * * figures 8,9 * [Y] 10,45-49; | [Y]DE29903342U (GRZIBEK EGBERT [DE]) [Y] 10 * claims 1,5 * * figure 9 *; | [XY]US6485491 (FARRIS ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 26-32,34-44 * figures 1,25,28A,46,53 * [Y] 1-25,33,45-49; | [XY]US5810818 (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1,3,19-22,40,41,45,46 * figures 5,7,10 * [Y] 1-25,33,45-49 |