EP1605908 - RAPIDLY DISSOLVING EDIBLE FILM COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED FILM STRENGTH AND STABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVORY, Alisa, Ann 322 E 14th Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | 02 /
ROSSMAN, James, M. 1706 W Morrison Avenue Tampa, FL 33606 / US | 03 /
LEE, Kuo-Chung, Mark 6459 Katherine Manor Court Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | [2006/07] |
Former [2005/51] | 01 /
IVORY, Alisa, Ann 1602 Shenandoah Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45237 / US | ||
02 /
ROSSMAN, James, M. 7455 Adamo Drive Tampa, FL 33619 / US | |||
03 /
LEE, Kuo-Chung, Mark 6459 Katherine Manor Court Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | Representative(s) | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2005/51] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04758256.4 | 24.03.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US08963 | Priority number, date | US20030457875P | 26.03.2003 Original published format: US 457875 P | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004087089 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605908 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A61K8/027 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELL AUFLÖSENDE ESSBARE FILMZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER FILMSTÄRKE UND STABILITÄT | [2005/51] | English: | RAPIDLY DISSOLVING EDIBLE FILM COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED FILM STRENGTH AND STABILITY | [2005/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE FILM COMESTIBLE A DISSOLUTION RAPIDE A TENUE ET STABILITE DE FILM AMELIOREES | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2004060335 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [E] 1-13 * examples 1-4 *; | [X]US5458892 (YATKA ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 14 * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 24; example 134 * * column 1, line 18 - line 28 * * column 8, line 60 - line 62 *; | [X]US2003053962 (ZERBE HORST G [CA], et al) [X] 1-16,18 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0014] - [0017] - [0020] , [0023] , [0025] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] *; | [X]WO03011259 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]) [X] 1-16,18 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5; claim 22 * * page 7, line 9 - line 15 * * page 7, line 21 - line 29; example - *; | [A]US5470681 (BRUNNER TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15,17 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 19 *; | [AD]WO0018365 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [AD] 1-16,18 * the whole document * |