EP1629558 - TUNGSTEN-BASED ELECTROCATALYST AND FUEL CELL CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Tungsten & Powders Corp. 4 Hawes Street Towanda, PA 18848 / US | [2009/49] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIAN, Joel, B. 37 Third Street Towanda, Pennsylvania 18848 / US | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04758265.5 | 25.03.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004US09019 | Priority number, date | US20030320056P | 26.03.2003 Original published format: US 320056 P | [2006/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088780 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629558 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M4/90, C01G41/02, B01J23/30 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
H01M4/9016 (EP,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,US);
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
C01G41/00 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M4/9083 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | 15.09.2005 | LT | 15.09.2005 | LV | 15.09.2005 | MK | 15.09.2005 | Title | German: | ELEKTROKATALYSATOR AUF WOLFRAMBASIS UND BRENNSTOFFZELLE DAMIT | [2006/09] | English: | TUNGSTEN-BASED ELECTROCATALYST AND FUEL CELL CONTAINING SAME | [2006/09] | French: | ELECTROCATALYSEUR A BASE DE TUNGSTENE ET PILE A COMBUSTIBLE CONTENANT LEDIT ELECTROCATALYSEUR | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2009 | 31.03.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4232097 (SHANKS HOWARD R, et al) [X] 10* column 2, lines 49-54 *; | [Y]US5298343 (SAVADOGO OUMAROU [CA], et al) [Y] 4-7 * example 7 *; | [Y] - L. BARTHA, A.B. KISS, T. SZALAY, "Chemistry of Tungsten Oxide Bronzes", INT. J. OF REFRACTORY METALS & HARD MATERIALS, Great Britain, (1995), vol. 13, pages 77 - 91, XP002445951 [Y] 4-7 * page 81, column LEFT, lines 13-15 * * page 85, column RIGHT, lines 6-12; tables 5,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0263-4368(94)00031-X | International search | [X]US4910181 (ANGEVINE PHILIP J [US], et al); | [Y]US2002111267 (CHRISTIAN JOEL B [US], et al); | [Y]US3507701 (BROYDE BARRET); | [A]US4339424 (JACOBSON ALLAN J, et al) |