EP1616054 - WASTE COLLECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perkitny, Jerzy 17810 Lake Road Lakewood, OH 44107 / US | For all designated states Good, Sidney R. 2043 Random Road, 07 Cleveland, OH 44106 / US | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04758308.3 | 26.03.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004US09109 | Priority number, date | US20030458594P | 28.03.2003 Original published format: US 458594 P | US20030476686P | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 476686 P | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088046 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616054 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E01H1/12 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
E01H1/1206 (EP,US);
E01H2001/1246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABFALLSAMMELVORRICHTUNG | [2006/03] | English: | WASTE COLLECTION DEVICE | [2006/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE DE DECHETS | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 06.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2007 | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]US4078838 (NADRATOWSKI ROBERT W) [DX] 1,10,18,19,24-28,38,39 [Y] 20-22; | [X]US4253691 (LIU WILLIAM Y) [X] 1,10,18,19,24-28,38,39 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 64; figure - *; | [Y]DE3309162 (KRUPS STIFTUNG [DE]) [Y] 20-22 * abstract *; | [A]GB2227645 (SEWELL PETER JOHN, et al) [A] 1,18,24-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9320285 (CHELWOOD INTERIOR PRODUCTS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,27 * abstract *; | [A]US3910619 (SCHMIELER WILLIAM L) [A] 24,25 * abstract *; | [A]US4986587 (LOZANO AMARO [US]) [A] 20-22 * abstract * | by applicant | US5382063 | US4078838 |