EP1611533 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENTLY SEARCHING A FORWARDING DATABASE THAT IS SPLIT INTO A BOUNDED NUMBER OF SUB-DATABASES HAVING A BOUNDED SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netlogic, Inc. 1875 Charleston Road Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP. 3901 North First Street San Jose CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATACHARY, Srinivasan 637 Timberpine Ave. Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
GUPTA, Pankaj 260 Lassen Ave. Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Bosch, Matthias Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Bosch, Matthias Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Lohr, Georg Patentanwltskanzlei Dr. Lohr Hauptstrasse 40 82223 Eichenau / DE | Application number, filing date | 04758519.5 | 26.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004US09531 | Priority number, date | US20030402887 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: US 402887 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004088548 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611533 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G06F16/322 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/74591 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US);
Y10S707/99943 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EFFIZIENTEN DURCHSUCHEN EINER WEITERLEITUNGSDATENBANK, DIE IN EINE BEGRENZTE ANZAHL VON SUBDATENBANKEN MIT BEGRENZTER GRÖSSE AUFGETEILT IST | [2006/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENTLY SEARCHING A FORWARDING DATABASE THAT IS SPLIT INTO A BOUNDED NUMBER OF SUB-DATABASES HAVING A BOUNDED SIZE | [2006/01] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODE POUR UNE RECHERCHE EFFICACE DANS UNE BASE DE DONNEES DE REACHEMINEMENT QUI EST DIVISEE EN UN NOMBRE LIMITE DE SOUS-BASES DE DONNEES PRESENTANT UNE TAILLE LIMITEE | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 14.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 26.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002089937 (VENKATACHARY SRINIVASAN [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 2, paragraph 13 - page 2, paragraph 19 * * page 3, paragraph 24 - page 3, paragraph 29 * * page 3, paragraph 40 - page 4, paragraph 48 * * page 6, paragraph 65 - page 6, paragraph 66 *; | [A] - CHEN W E ET AL, "A fast and scalable ip lookup scheme for high-speed networks*", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (19990928), pages 211 - 218, XP010354942 [A] 1-28 * abstract * * page 211, column R, line 21 - page 212, column L, line 42 * * page 212, column R, line 39 - page 214, column R, line 19 * * page 215, column L, line 13 - page 215, column R, line 26 * | [A] - PAO D ET AL, "Efficient hardware architecture for fast IP address lookup", PROCEEDINGS IEEE INFOCOM 2002. THE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS. 21ST. ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER ANDCOMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. NEW YORK, NY, JUNE 23 - 27, 2002, PROCEEDINGS IEEE INFOCOM. THE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICA, (20020623), VOL. 1 OF 3. CONF. 21, ISBN 0-7803-7476-2, pages 555 - 561, XP010593616 [A] 1-28 * abstract * * page 556, column L, line 43 - page 556, column R, line 55 * * page 557, column L, line 22 - page 558, column L, line 45 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2002.1019300 | [A] - AKHBARIZADEH M ET AL, "Reconfigurable memory architecture for scalable IP forwarding engines", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (20021014), pages 432 - 437, XP010610914 [A] 1-28 * page 432, column L, line 22 - page 432, column R, line 48 * * page 433, column L, line 1 - page 433, column L, line 45 * * page 433, column R, line 47 - page 434, column L, line 50 * | [A] - YU D ET AL, "FORWARDING ENGINE FOR FAST ROUTING LOOKUPS AND UPDATES", 1999 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. GLOBECOM'99. SEAMLESS INTERCONNECTION FOR UNIVERSAL SERVICES. RIO DE JANEIRO, BRAZIL, DEC. 5-9, 1999, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19991205), VOL. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5797-3, pages 1556 - 1564, XP001016965 [A] 1-28 * abstract * * page 1556, column L, line 17 - page 1556, column L, line 35 * * page 1556, column R, line 31 - page 1557, column L, line 20 * * page 1558, column L, line 27 - page 1558, column R, line 13 * | by applicant | US2002089937 |