EP1616369 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUBSTANTIALLY REDUCING ELECTRICAL DISPLACEMENT CURRENT FLOW BETWEEN INPUT AND OUTPUT CIRCUITS COUPLED TO INPUT AND OUTPUT WINDINGS OF AN ENERGY TRANSFER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose, California 95138 / US | [2008/23] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose California 95138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Chan, Woong A-4802 Tower Palace, Apt. 467, Dogok-Dong Kangnam-Gu, Seoul 135-270 / KR | [2007/25] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
PARK, Chan, Woong A-4802 Tower Palace, Apt. 467, Dogok-Dong Kangnam-Gu, Seoul 135-270 / US | ||
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
PARK, Chan, Woong 390 La Strada Drive, 27 San Jose, CA 95123 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London, WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04758737.3 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004US10078 | Priority number, date | US20030405373 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: US 405373 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004091052 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616369 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/38, H01F27/36, H02M3/28 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
H02M3/28 (EP,US);
H01F27/36 (EP,US);
H01F27/363 (EP,US);
H01F27/38 (EP,US);
H01F2038/026 (EP,US);
H01F27/346 (EP,US);
H01F38/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | H01F27/28 | ||
Former IPC [2006/03] | H01R3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2006/27] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WESENTLICHEN VERRINGERUNG DES ELEKTRISCHEN VERSCHIEBUNGSTROMFLUSSES ZWISCHEN EINGANGS- UND AUSGANGSSCHALTKREISEN, DIE AN EINGANGS- UND AUSGANGSWICKLUNGEN EINES ENERGIETRANSFERELEMENTS ANGEKOPPELT SIND | [2006/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUBSTANTIALLY REDUCING ELECTRICAL DISPLACEMENT CURRENT FLOW BETWEEN INPUT AND OUTPUT CIRCUITS COUPLED TO INPUT AND OUTPUT WINDINGS OF AN ENERGY TRANSFER ELEMENT | [2006/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A REDUIRE SENSIBLEMENT LE FLUX DE COURANT DE DEPLACEMENT ENTRE LES CIRCUITS D'ENTREE ET DE SORTIE COUPLES AUX BOBINES D'ENTREE ET DE SORTIE D'UN ELEMENT DE TRANSFERT D'ENERGIE | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 07.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS59129571 (TDK CORP) [Y] 1* abstract *; | [Y]JPH04162408 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [XYI]US5724236 (OGLESBEE JOHN W [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10,12-15,17,19,20,23 * figures 2,4 * * column 1, lines 7-6 * * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 48 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 54; figure 1 * [Y] 1 [I] 2,11,18; | [Y]EP1239578 (POWER INTEGRATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0008] , [0026] , [0033] - [0049] * | International search | [A]US5150046 (LIM SEOK G [KR]); | [A]JPH1052036 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]US4518941 (HARADA HAJIME [JP]) |