EP1622955 - CROSSLINKABLE MATERIALS FOR ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZLX Techno Ltd. 704 228th Street, NE, PMB 692 Sammamish, WA 98074 / US | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLY, Stephen, M. 25 Richmond Way Beverley HU17 8XA / GB | 02 /
O'NEILL, Maryl 37 Wellesley Avenue Hull HU6 7LN / GB | 03 /
ALDRED, Matthew, P. 564A Beverley Road Hull HU6 7LG / GB | 04 /
VLACHOS, Panagiotis 11 Gouldsborough Court, Alexandra Road Hull HU5 2NJ / GB | 05 /
KOCH, Gene, C. 85 Cedar Run Road Bayville, NJ 08721 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04758981.7 | 09.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US09276 | Priority number, date | US20030461444P | 09.04.2003 Original published format: US 461444 P | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004093154 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622955 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G2/00, C08F2/46, C09K19/52, H05B33/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (KR);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (KR);
C08G2/00 (KR);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K10/00 (KR);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
H10K85/141 (EP,US);
H10K85/311 (EP,US);
H10K85/346 (EP,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
H10K85/655 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1425 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1433 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1458 (EP,US);
C09K2323/04 (EP,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
H10K85/649 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERNETZBARE MATERIALIEN FÜR ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2006/06] | English: | CROSSLINKABLE MATERIALS FOR ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICES AND METHODS | [2006/06] | French: | MATIERES RETICULABLES DESTINEES A DES DISPOSITIFS ELECTROLUMINESCENTS ORGANIQUES ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 01.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003027017 (O'NEILL MARY [GB], et al); | [X] - CONTORET, A.E.A. ET AL., "The photopolymerization and Cross-Linking of Electroluminescent Liquid Crystals Containing Methacrylate and Diene Photopolymerizable End Groups for multilayer Organic Light-Emitting Diodes", CHEM. MATER., (2002), vol. 14, pages 1477 - 1487, XP001163183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm011111f | [Y] - CONTORET, A.E.A. ET AL., "Polarized Electroluminescence from an Anisotropic Nematic Network on a non-contact Photoalignment Layer", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2000), vol. 12, no. 13, pages 971 - 974, XP000937086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4095(200006)12:13<971::AID-ADMA971>3.0.CO;2-J | [Y] - INAOKA, S. ET AL., "Patterning and electrochemical deposition of conjugated and conducting polymers in organic light emitting diodes", POLYMER PREPRINTS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 808 - 809, XP001028579 | [Y] - CUI, J. ET AL., "Interfacial Microstructure Function in Organic Light-Emitting Diodes: Assembled Tetraaryldiamine and Copper Phthalocyanine Interlayers", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2002), vol. 14, no. 8, pages 565 - 569, XP001129788 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4095(20020418)14:8<565::AID-ADMA565>3.0.CO;2-3 |