EP1613365 - EMBOLIC OCCLUSION OF UTERINE ARTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vascular Control Systems, Inc. 32236-F Paseo Adelanto San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Vascular Control Systems, Inc. 32236-E Paseo Adelanto San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBANK, Fred, H. 12 Old Ranch Road Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
ALTIERI, Greig 1102 Temple Hills Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | 03 /
JONES, Michael, L. 6332 Camino Marinero San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04759154.0 | 04.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004US10525 | Priority number, date | US20030411690 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: US 411690 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004091683 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1613365 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/06 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61L2430/36 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L24/046, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L24/046, C08L71/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMBOLIEVERSCHLUSS VON GEBÄRMUTTERARTERIEN | [2006/02] | English: | EMBOLIC OCCLUSION OF UTERINE ARTERIES | [2006/02] | French: | OCCLUSION EMBOLIQUE D'ARTERES UTERINES | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0168720 (BIOCURE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, lines 2-26 * * page 13, line 15 - page 16, line 6 * * page 20, lines 20-33 * * page 24, lines 15,16 * * table 3 *; | [Y]WO0200192 (CARBON MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES IN [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, lines 15-20 *; | [Y]WO0180713 (HYSTERX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 11, lines 20-25 * * page 15, lines 9-17 *; | [X]WO9922774 (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 8-52 * claims 1,2,8,9 *; | [X]WO0071064 (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 8-52 * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 13 * * page 12, lines 15-20 * * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 2 *; | [Y]WO0001342 (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 8-31,37-52 * page 6, lines 10-20 * * page 7, lines 22-29 * * page 9, lines 10-19 *; | [Y]WO9943366 (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 8-31,37-52 * page 5, lines 15-18 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 4 * * page 10, lines 12-21 *; | [X]US2002090398 (DUNN RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 32-36 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031]; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US4938763 (DUNN RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 32-36 * column 2, lines 51-59 * * column 4, lines 44-68 * * column 5, lines 1-19 * * column 6, lines 9-30 *; | [X]WO0024374 (ATRIX LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 32-36 * page 2, lines 14-29 * * page 5, lines 10-21 * * page 7, lines 10-26 *; | [X]EP1266664 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 32-36 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0018] *; | [X]WO0249573 (BHAGWATWAR HARSHAL PRABHAKAR [IN], et al) [X] 32-36 * page 8, lines 20-31 * * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 4 * * page 13, lines 4-29 * |