EP1616015 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO INCREASE PLANT RESISTANCE TO STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 3000 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESSAN, Ray, A. 5600 Prophet's Rock Road West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04759170.6 | 07.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004US10599 | Priority number, date | US20030461345P | 09.04.2003 Original published format: US 461345 P | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004092326 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616015 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616015 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/00 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/8273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER RESISTENZ VON PFLANZEN GEGENÜBER STRESS | [2006/03] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS TO INCREASE PLANT RESISTANCE TO STRESS | [2006/03] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS AUGMENTANT LA RESISTANCE DES PLANTES AU STRESS | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | BE | 08.08.2007 | CH | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | CZ | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | EE | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | LI | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | PL | 08.08.2007 | RO | 08.08.2007 | SI | 08.08.2007 | SK | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | BG | 08.11.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | DE | 09.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | HU | 09.02.2008 | FR | 04.04.2008 | IE | 07.04.2008 | LU | 07.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
TR | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
TR | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
DE | 09.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1033405 (CERES INC [US]) [X] 8-19 * SEQ ID NO: 67644 - 67646 *; | [A]WO0132002 (BASF CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * examples 1,3; table 1 *; | [X] - "Arabidopsis thaliana putative transcription factor (MYB8) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (19991229), Database accession no. AF207991, URL: EBI, XP002314994 [X] 8-19 * the whole document * | [A] - STRACKE R ET AL, "THE R2R3-MYB GENE FAMILY IN ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA", CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, QUADRANT SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES, GB, (2001), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1369-5266, pages 447 - 456, XP001058081 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-5266(00)00199-0 | [A] - KASUGA MIE ET AL, "Improving plant drought, salt, and freezing tolerance by gene transfer of a single stress-inducible transcription factor", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUB. CO, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199903), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 287 - 291, XP002173128 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/7036 | [A] - ABE HIROSHI ET AL, "Arabidopsis AtMYC2 (bHLH) and AtMYB2 (MYB) function as transcriptional activators in abscisic acid signaling.", PLANT CELL, (200301), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 63 - 78, XP002314993 [A] 1-23 * page 70, column L; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.006130 | [A] - KRANZ H D ET AL, "TOWARDS FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERISATION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE R2R3-MYB GENE FAMILY FROM ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA", PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (1998), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 263 - 276, XP000929447 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313x.1998.00278.x |