EP1617892 - MEDICAL DEVICE WITH THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/04] | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH THERAPEUTIC AGENTS. | ||
[2007/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Incorporated 750 Daniels Way Bloomington, Indiana 47404 / US | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Ram, H. 1251 W. Church Lane Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | 02 /
SIROTA, Daniel, J. 3307 Mulberry Drive Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | 03 /
AMARANT, Paul, D. 448 Laurelwood Drive Bloomington, IN 47401 / US | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS POWELL Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04759746.3 | 24.03.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004US08896 | Priority number, date | US20030414939 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 414939 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004093962 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617892 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617892 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61M25/00 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0057 (EP,US);
A61M25/0017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IE [2006/30] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINPRODUKT MIT THERAPEUTISCHEN MITTELN | [2006/04] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2007/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL COMPRENANT DES AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2006/04] |
Former [2006/04] | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH THERAPEUTIC AGENTS. | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 08.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/23] | GB | 24.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3625214 (HIGUCHI TAKERU) [A] 1-19,24* abstract *; | [A]US3926188 (BAKER RICHARD W, et al) [A] 1-19,24 * figures 1,5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]CH649916 (SULZER AG) [A] 1-19,24 * abstract *; | [XA]WO9835717 (BROWN JOE E [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,15-19,24 * page 26, line 13 - page 28, line 5; figure 29 * [A] 9,11-14 |