EP1622981 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE SURFACE ADHESION OF RESIN COMPOSITIONS TO POLYURETHANE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNAN, Ganesh 202, Victorian Willows Airport Road Bangalore 560017 / IN | 02 /
MHETAR, Vijay, Ramchandra 7 Eastmount Dr. 222 Slingerlands, NY 12159 / US | 03 /
DENNISTON, Mark P.O. Box 221 Altamont, NY 12009 / US | 04 /
LEWIS, Mark 111 Stippa Road Coxsackie, NY 12051 / US | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Bublak, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Bublak, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04759784.4 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004US09980 | Priority number, date | US20030420974 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: US 420974 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004094530 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622981 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622981 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08L23/00, C08K5/17, C08K5/37, C08L25/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
C08K5/57 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (KR);
C08K5/17 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/37 (KR);
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
C08G2650/50 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/17, C08L71/12 (EP,US);
C08K5/57, C08L71/12 (US,EP);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER OBERFLÄCHENHAFTUNG VON HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF | [2006/06] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE SURFACE ADHESION OF RESIN COMPOSITIONS TO POLYURETHANE FOAM | [2006/06] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DESTINES A AMELIORER L'ADHESION EN SURFACE DE COMPOSITIONS DE RESINE A DE LA MOUSSE DE POLYURETHANE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2008 | BE | 16.01.2008 | CH | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | CZ | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | LI | 16.01.2008 | NL | 16.01.2008 | PL | 16.01.2008 | RO | 16.01.2008 | SI | 16.01.2008 | SK | 16.01.2008 | TR | 16.01.2008 | IE | 01.04.2008 | LU | 01.04.2008 | BG | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | HU | 17.07.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
TR | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
LU | 01.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
LU | 01.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
LU | 01.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 01.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
PL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 16.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0493674 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0605195 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD [JP]) [X] 1* example - *; | [X]EP0751185 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-30 * claim -; table - *; | [X]EP0849329 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-30 * example -; claim -; table - *; | [X]US6303216 (CHAO HERBERT SHIN-I [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * claim -; table - *; | [X]US6350514 (VENDERBOSCH ROBERT WALTER [NL]) [X] 1-30 * claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US6365665 (CHAO HERBERT SHIN-I [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * claim - * |