EP1536917 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VALVE SEATS, AND VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gehring GmbH & Co. KG Gehringstrasse 28 73760 Ostfildern / DE | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLORES, Gerhard Gartenstrasse 39 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 02 /
ZANG, Harald Ontariostrasse 68 70329 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
WEBER, Alexander Heumadener Strasse 49 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 04 /
ZOUDLIK, Carsten Dr. Gminder Strasse 15 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Dreiss, Uwe DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Dreiss, Uwe, Prof. Dr. jur. Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04760180.2 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/23] | WO2004EP07062 | Priority number, date | EP20030014909 | 01.07.2003 Original published format: EP 03014909 | [2005/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005000524 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1536917 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536917 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B24B15/00 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
B24B15/00 (EP);
B24B15/02 (EP);
B24B33/02 (EP);
F16K25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VENTILSITZEN UND VENTIL | [2005/23] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VALVE SEATS, AND VALVE | [2005/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SIEGES DE SOUPAPES ET SOUPAPE | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE KADIA Produktion GmbH + Co. Fabrikstrasse 2 72622 Nürtingen / DE Opponent's representative Muschik, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE KADIA Produktion GmbH + Co. Fabrikstrasse 2 72622 Nürtingen / DE Opponent's representative Muschik, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 05.10.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/37] | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2005 | EE | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | PL | 30.11.2005 | RO | 30.11.2005 | SI | 30.11.2005 | SK | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | BG | 28.02.2006 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | HU | 01.06.2006 | AT | 30.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | LU | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | CZ | 30.06.2007 | ES | 01.07.2007 | [2020/33] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 30.11.2005 | |
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
LU | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | EE | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
LU | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
AT | 30.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
PL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19757117 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,11 * column 1, line 5 - column 5, line 51; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5954312 (EARNHARDT DANIEL E [US]); | [A]US2002040523 (GOLDAU HARALD [DE], et al); | [DA]EP0955128 (THIELENHAUS ERNST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015]; figures 1-4 * |