EP1618549 - LED ILLUMINATION SOURCE/DISPLAY WITH INDIVIDUAL LED BRIGHTNESS MONITORING CAPABILITY AND CALIBRATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visioneered Image Systems, Inc. 10561 Garden Grove Boulevard Garden Grove, CA 92843 / US | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLDT JR., Norton, K. 24272 Sunnybrook Circle Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | 02 /
DECKERT, Curtis, K. 18061 Darmel Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, James, C. 1642 Foothill Blvd. Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 04 /
LISIECKI, Andrew, I. 12 Gillman Street Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Jackson, David Spence REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04760285.9 | 20.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004US12122 | Priority number, date | US20030465437P | 25.04.2003 Original published format: US 465437 P | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097783 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618549 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H04N17/04 (EP,US);
G09G3/32 (EP,KR,US);
G01J1/46 (EP);
G01J3/506 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G01J2001/4252 (EP);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
G09G2320/029 (EP,US);
G09G2320/043 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0693 (EP,US);
G09G2330/12 (EP,US);
G09G2360/144 (EP,US);
G09G2360/147 (EP,US);
G09G2360/148 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | 25.10.2005 | HR | 25.10.2005 | LT | 25.10.2005 | LV | 25.10.2005 | MK | 25.10.2005 | Title | German: | LED-BELEUCHTUNGSQUELLE/-ANZEIGE MIT INDIVIDUELLER LED-HELLIGKEITSÜBERWACHUNGSFÄHIGKEIT UND KALIBRATIONSVERFAHREN | [2006/04] | English: | LED ILLUMINATION SOURCE/DISPLAY WITH INDIVIDUAL LED BRIGHTNESS MONITORING CAPABILITY AND CALIBRATION METHOD | [2006/04] | French: | AFFICHAGE/SOURCE D'ECLAIRAGE A DEL AYANT LA CAPACITE DE SURVEILLER LA LUMINOSITE DES DEL INDIVIDUELLES, ET PROCEDE DE CALIBRAGE | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 22.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1077444 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0010] , [0013] , [0014] , [0018] - [0026] - [0047] , [0049] , [0050]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6291942 (ODAGIRI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 6, line 1 - line 45; figure 5 *; | [X]EP1194013 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0011] - [0013] - [0017] , [0020] , [0023] - [0028] - [0032]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]US2002047550 (TANADA YOSHIFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] - [0015] - [0027] - [0029] - [0064] , [0067] - [0071] - [0103] - [0109] - [0118] - [0120] - [0125]; figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [PA]EP1335430 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [PA] 1-24* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5550362 (SHERMAN DAVID M [US]); | [A]US5986576 (ARMSTRONG SHELDYN KYLE [US]); | [A]US2002140378 (VOLK KARL RICHARD [US], et al) |