EP1601940 - SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joule Microsystems Canada Inc. 104-1628 Fosters Way Delta British Columbia V6M 6S6 / CA | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Bruce, W. 6651 184a Street Cloverdale, British Columbia V3S 9A8 / CA | 02 /
MCCONNELL, Peter, R., H. 4755 West 7th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1C7 / CA | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04760757.7 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004CA00363 | Priority number, date | US20030453479P | 12.03.2003 Original published format: US 453479 P | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004102137 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601940 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/44 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
G01S7/4802 (EP,US);
G01J3/4406 (EP,US);
G01S17/26 (EP,US);
G01S17/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2005/49] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2005/49] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/32] | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2007 | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6207961 (LO K PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 3 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19951154 (GARWE FRANK [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 10 * |