EP1627025 - FLUORESCENT POLYMERIC MATERIALS CONTAINING LIPID SOLUBLE RHODAMINE DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Biosystems, LLC 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2016/30] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Alley Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Applera Corporation 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Applera Corporation 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, CA 94404-1128 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Joe, Y.L. 7867 Pineville Circle Castro Valley, CA 94552 / US | 02 /
MENCHEN, Steven, M. 768 Vanda Way Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 03 /
RUIMING, Zou 1257 Martinique Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
BENSON, Scott, C. 1723 Clinton Avenue Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2012/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Renken, Joachim, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/08] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04760869.0 | 04.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004US13798 | Priority number, date | US20030469030P | 09.05.2003 Original published format: US 469030 P | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101708 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1627025 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1627025 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, C09B11/24 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
C09B67/0092 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (US);
C07D311/80 (EP,US);
C09B11/24 (EP,US);
C09B67/0097 (EP,US);
C09B69/103 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2006/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDE KUNSTSTOFFE MIT GEHALT AN LIPIDLÖSLICHEN RHODAMINFARBSTOFFEN | [2006/08] | English: | FLUORESCENT POLYMERIC MATERIALS CONTAINING LIPID SOLUBLE RHODAMINE DYES | [2006/08] | French: | MATERIAUX POLYMERIQUES FLUORESCENTS CONTENANT DES COLORANTS DE RHODAMINE LIPOSOLUBLES | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 01.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2004 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | IE | 04.05.2017 | LU | 04.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.05.2004 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.05.2004 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/29] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11279426 ; | [A]US4640893 (MANGEL WALTER F [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0623599 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-12,80 * page 3, line 35 - line 45 * * examples A5,A6,A7 * * claim 16 * * page 4, line 16 - line 44 *; | [DX]US5410053 (HAHN ERWIN [DE], et al) [DX] 1-13,80 * compounds with formulas II and 4;; claims 21,22 *; | [DX]US5750409 (HERRMANN RUPERT [DE], et al) [DX] 1-13,80 * compounds of formulas 2,6,8-10,12-15,18 *; | [A] - TSUKANOVA V ET AL, "Microscopic organization of long-chain rhodamine molecules in monolayers at the air/water interface", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B ACS USA, (20020425), vol. 106, no. 16, ISSN 1089-5647, pages 4203 - 4213, XP002296090 [A] 1-12,80 * page 4204 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp0137367 | [A] - MOHR G ET AL, "Application of potential-sensitive fluorescent dyes in anion- and cation-sensitive polymer membranes", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19970301), vol. 39, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 239 - 245, XP004087749 [A] 1,80 * page 242 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(97)80211-0 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 03, Database accession no. 2000-026719, XP002296091 & JPH11279426 A 19991012 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [A] 1,7-12 * abstract * * page 5, compound Rh-09 page 6, compound Rh-19 * | Examination | EP1422282 |