EP1663174 - SINGLE UNIT PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF A FIBRATE AND A HOMOCYSTEINE REDUCING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galephar M/F 39, rue du Parc Industriel 6900 Marche-en-Famenne / BE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDERBIST, Francis Alsembergsesteenweg 1116 B-1650 Beersel / BE | 02 /
BAUDIER, Philippe Rue Engeland 338 B-1180 Uccle / BE | 03 /
DEBOECK, Arthur HCO2 Box 14885, Gurabo Puerto Rico00778 / US | 04 /
SERENO, Antonio Passiewyk 21 B-1820 Melsbroeck / BE | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A. 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2007/26] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/23] | Powis de Tenbossche, Roland, et al Cabinet Bede S.A., Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 04761472.2 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004BE00111 | Priority number, date | WO2003BE00132 | 05.08.2003 Original published format: PCT/BE0300/132 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011642 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663174 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/52, A61K9/36 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/4415 (EP);
A61K31/216 (EP);
A61K31/525 (EP);
A61K31/714 (EP);
A61K9/4808 (EP);
A61K9/5084 (EP);
A61K9/1623 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/2022 (EP);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2826 (EP);
A61K9/284 (EP);
A61K9/2866 (EP);
A61K9/4858 (EP);
A61K9/4866 (EP);
A61K9/5047 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/216, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINZELNE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM GEMISCH AUS EINEM FIBRAT UND EINEM HOMOCYSTEINE-REDUKTIONSMITTEL | [2006/23] | English: | SINGLE UNIT PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF A FIBRATE AND A HOMOCYSTEINE REDUCING AGENT | [2006/23] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE A UNITE SIMPLE COMPRENANT UN MELANGE DE FIBRANNE ET UN AGENT REDUCTEUR D'HOMOCYSTEINE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 09.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO0156609 (DIERKES JUTTA ; LULEY KLAUS (DE); WESTPHAL SABINE (DE)) [X] 1-4,8-12,15-17,19 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 13 * * page 8, line 5 - line 15 * [Y] 5,6,18 [I] 7,12-14,18,20,21; | [XI]DE19910682 (DIERKES JUTTA ; LULEY CLAUS (DE); WESTPHAL SABINE (DE)) [X] 1-4,9,11,15-17 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 32 * * claims 1,2 * [I] 7,12-14,19-21; | [Y]WO03013501 (SERENO ANTONIO ; SMB SA LAB (BE); BAUDIER PHILIPPE (BE); VANDERBIST FR) [Y] 5,18 * page 5, line 13 - line 26 * * example - *; | [A]US6465013 (DEBERNARDI DOUGLAS P) [A] * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 8 * * example - * | [IY] - DIERKES JUTTA ET AL, "Vitamin supplementation can markedly reduce the homocysteine elevation induced by fenofibrate", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (200109), vol. 158, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9150, pages 161 - 164, XP002288439 [I] 1-4,6-21 * abstract * * page 162, column L, line 6 - line 10 * * page 163, paragraph 1 * [Y] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(00)00766-8 |