EP1653994 - USE OF CXCL6 CHEMOKINE IN THE PREVENTION OR REPAIR OF CARTILAGE DEFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIGENIX N.V. Romeinse straat 12 bus 2 3001 Leuven / BE | [2010/11] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states TIGENIX N.V. Technologielaan 3 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Tigenix N.V. Technologielaan 3 3001 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUYTEN, Frank Baron D'Huartlaan 193 1950 Kraainem / BE | 02 /
DE BARI, Cosimo 18 Ethelbert Close Bromley, Kent BR1 1JB / GB | 03 /
DELL'ACCIO, Francesco 150 Farnaby Road Bromley, Kent BR2 0BB / GB | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 04761478.9 | 12.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004BE00117 | Priority number, date | US20030494516P | 12.08.2003 Original published format: US 494516 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005014026 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1653994 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1653994 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/19, A61P19/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61K35/32 (EP,US);
A61K38/19 (NO);
A61K38/00 (NO);
A61K38/195 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/32, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/195, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | 17.01.2006 | HR | 17.01.2006 | LT | 17.01.2006 | LV | 17.01.2006 | MK | 17.01.2006 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CXCL6 CHEMOKIN BEI DER PRÄVENTION ODER REPARATUR VON KNORPELDEFEKTEN | [2006/19] | English: | USE OF CXCL6 CHEMOKINE IN THE PREVENTION OR REPAIR OF CARTILAGE DEFECTS | [2006/19] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE CHIMIOKINE CXCL6 DANS LA PREVENTION OU LA REPARATION DE DEFAUTS AU NIVEAU DU CARTILAGE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | LU | 12.08.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | SI | 25.11.2009 | |
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5786217 (TUBO ROSS A [US], et al) [DX] 9-12 * claim - *; | [DXA]US6410268 (NI JIAN [US], et al) [DX] 15 * column 25, line 29; example 4 * [A] 1-14,17-19; | [DA]US6413511 (GLORIOSO JOSEPH C [US], et al); | [DX]US2002123483 (SAXENA GEETA [CA], et al) [DX] 25,26 * paragraph [0016]; claim - *; | [X]EP1312614 (GENODYSSEE [FR]) [X] 15 * claim 22 *; | [DX] - WUYTS ANJA ET AL, "The CXC chemokine GCP-2/CXCL6 is predominantly induced in mesenchymal cells by interleukin-1beta and is down-regulated by interferon-gamma: Comparison with interleukin-8/CXCL8.", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (200301), vol. 83, no. 1, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 23 - 34, XP002314496 [DX] 9-12,15-17,20-22,29-31 * page 25, column 2 - page 26, column 1; figure 4 * |