EP1658648 - METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF ORGANIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT WITH HIGH RESOLUTION STRUCTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/21] | ORGANIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT WITH HIGH RESOLUTION STRUCTURING, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2009/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolyIC GmbH & Co. KG Tucherstrasse 2 90763 Fürth / DE | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states PolyIC GmbH & Co. KG Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100 91052 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIX, Walter Rötenäckerstrasse 7 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
MARTIN, Ronan Würzburgerring 33 91056 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
ULLMANN, Andreas Mondstrasse 17a 90513 Zirdorf / DE | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Zinsinger, Norbert Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Zinsinger, Norbert Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, P.O. Box 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04762661.9 | 14.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004DE01816 | Priority number, date | DE20031039036 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339036 | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005022663 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658648 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658648 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H10K71/60 (EP,US);
H10K10/471 (EP,US);
H10K10/80 (EP,US);
H10K71/13 (EP,US);
H10K71/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | H01L51/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN ORGANISCHES ELEKTRONISCHES BAUTEIL MIT HOCHAUFGELÖSTER STRUKTURIERUNG | [2009/27] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF ORGANIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT WITH HIGH RESOLUTION STRUCTURING | [2009/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE A STRUCTURATION HAUTE RESOLUTION | [2009/27] |
Former [2006/21] | ORGANISCHES ELEKTRONISCHES BAUTEIL MIT HOCHAUFGELÖSTER STRUKTURIERUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAZU | ||
Former [2006/21] | ORGANIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT WITH HIGH RESOLUTION STRUCTURING, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2006/21] | COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE A STRUCTURATION HAUTE RESOLUTION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE COMPOSANT | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 24.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2009 | 28.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IE | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | AT | 14.08.2010 | LU | 14.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
AT | 14.08.2010 | ||
LU | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
AT | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
AT | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5994773 (HIRAKAWA TADASHI [JP]); | [Y]EP0966182 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]WO0247183 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP1237207 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2002170897 (HALL FRANK L [US]); | [LPX]WO2004042837 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) |