EP1663541 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CUP-SHAPED OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maiko Engineering GmbH Adam-Opel-Strasse 12 38112 Braunschweig / DE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARMBRUNN, Klaus Ottoweiler Strasse 6 38116 Braunschweig / DE | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 04762740.1 | 02.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004DE01953 | Priority number, date | DE20032020442U | 04.09.2003 Original published format: DE 20320442 U | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023451 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663541 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663541 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/44, B21D51/50, B21D22/22 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B21D51/44 (EP,US);
B21D22/22 (EP,US);
B21D51/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | 21.02.2006 | LV | 21.02.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES NAPFFÖRMIGEN GEGENSTANDES | [2006/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CUP-SHAPED OBJECT | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET EN FORME DE CUVETTE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 17.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IE | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | AT | 02.09.2010 | LU | 02.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | BE | 30.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
AT | 02.09.2010 | ||
LU | 02.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
AT | 02.09.2010 | ||
LU | 02.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
AT | 02.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
AT | 02.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
AT | 02.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
BE | 30.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE433094 (BERNARDIN BOTTLE CAP CO) [X] 1-10 * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]DD233036 (FZ F UMFORM U PLASTVERARBEITUN [DD]) [DA] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0279269 (RASSELSTEIN AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]EP0536952 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-10* figures 1A-1C * |