EP1670992 - SPREADER ARRANGEMENT FOR A ROAD MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epoke A/S Vejenvej 50, Askov 6600 Vejen / DK | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THISGAARD, Soren Odensevej 76 DK-5492 Vissenbjerg / DK | 02 /
MADSEN, Anders Teglgaard Sandervangvej 4 Askov, DK-6600 Vejen / DK | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Siiger, Joergen, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Siiger, Joergen, et al Chas. Hude A/S, H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 04762891.2 | 05.10.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004DK00671 | Priority number, date | DK20030001473 | 07.10.2003 Original published format: DK 200301473 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033417 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670992 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1670992 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01H10/00 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
E01H10/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 24.03.2006 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STREUANORDNUNG FÜR STRASSENMASCHINE | [2006/25] | English: | SPREADER ARRANGEMENT FOR A ROAD MACHINE | [2006/25] | French: | SYSTEME D'EPANDAGE POUR ENGIN DE VOIRIE ET ENGIN DE VOIRIE COMPRENANT UN SYSTEME D'EPANDAGE | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 27.04.2007 | Observations by third parties | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.2009 | BE | 16.12.2009 | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IT | 16.12.2009 | PL | 16.12.2009 | RO | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SI | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | ES | 27.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | HU | 17.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
HU | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CY | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
BE | 16.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
RO | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
PL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SI | 16.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1569986 (KAHLBACHER A) [X] 1-17,1-17,1-17 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [X]US4442979 (KUEPPER WILLY [DE]) [X] 1-17,1-17,1-17 * column 5, line 29 - column 8, line 30; figure - * * column 5, line 29 - column 8, line 30; figure - * * column 5, line 29 - column 8, line 30; figure - *; | [DA]EP0427995 (KUEPPER WEISSER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,17,1,17,1,17 * the whole document * * the whole document ** the whole document * | Examination | US3419221 | other | US3419221 |