EP1660022 - AGENT FOR COLOURING KERATIN FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] | 25.11.2022 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HFC Prestige International Holding Switzerland S.a.r.l. Chemin Louis-Hubert 1-3 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Wella GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Wella GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65825 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMENGER, Jürgen Heinrich-Rühl-Str. 38a 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | 02 /
BRAUN, Petra Schluckenauer Strasse 14 64839 Münster / DE | 03 /
KUJAWA, Jolanthe Schulzweg 5 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
GLATTFELDER, Martina In den Gänsgräben 10 68542 Heddesheim / DE | 05 /
ENTZMINGER, Anne Murstr. 10 64347 Griesheim / DE | 06 /
SALLWEY, Anette Eifelstr. 13 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | 07 /
DEUTZ, Herbert 22171 Bauhinia Court Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | [2007/11] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
SCHMENGER, Jürgen Heinrich-Rühl-Str. 38a 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | ||
02 /
BRAUN, Petra Schluckenauer Strasse 14 64839 Münster / DE | |||
03 /
KUJAWA, Jolanthe Schulzweg 5 64289 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
GLATTFELDER, Martina In den Gänsgräben 10 68542 Heddesheim / DE | |||
05 /
ENTZMINGER, Anne Murstr. 10 64347 Griesheim / DE | |||
06 /
SALLWEY, Anette Eifelstr. 13 64347 Griesheim / DE | |||
07 /
DEUTZ, Herbert 22171 Bauhinia Court Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie, et al 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2014/24] | Boubel, Thomas Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | Boubel, Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Wella Service GmbH Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/32] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Bockhorst, Matthias, et al Wella Aktiengesellschaft, Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763105.6 | 06.07.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004EP07366 | Priority number, date | DE20031040695 | 04.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10340695 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005032502 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660022 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660022 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/18 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/411 (EP,US);
A61K8/415 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,US);
A61K8/494 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR FÄRBUNG KERATINISCHER FASERN | [2016/35] | English: | AGENT FOR COLOURING KERATIN FIBRES | [2006/22] | French: | AGENT DE COLORATION DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES | [2006/22] |
Former [2006/22] | MITTEL ZUR FARBUNG KERATINISCHER FASERN | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2016 | 22.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.2018
18.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Semrau, Markus Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/08] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 31.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.08.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2019 | 13.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.07.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/52] | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 22.08.2019 | Appeal received No. T2424/19 | 23.10.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 25.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2004 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | AT | 06.07.2017 | IE | 06.07.2017 | LU | 06.07.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.07.2004 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.07.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.07.2004 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.07.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.07.2004 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.07.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.07.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 06.07.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
LU | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 06.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP1166748 (WELLA AG) [DX] 1,2,4-7 * example 65; claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP0782845 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [A] 1-7* example -; claim - *; | [X]DE19944527 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 61; example 3; claims 1,5,9,10,13-15 * | Opposition | EP1166748 | DE2633250 | - JOHN F. CORBETT, "Chemistry of hair colorant processes - Science as an Aid to Formulation and Development", Journal of the Society of Cosmetic Chemists, (19840900), vol. 35, pages 297 - 310, XP001624975 | - "Kosmetische mittel zur haarbehandlung", Wilfried Umbach, Kosmetik 2. Auflage, Stuttgart, (19950000), pages 294 - 297, XP055452731 | - Vergleichsversuche der Anmelderin, (20120217), URL: https://register. epo .org/ application ?number= EP 04763105 &Ing=de&tab=doclist | - Übersicht über die beanspruchten direktziehenden und Oxidationsfarbstoffe |