EP1644122 - CENTRIFUGE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF CENTRIFUGAL DRUMS PROVIDED WITH PACKETS OF DISKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Westfalia Separator GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Westfalia Separator GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Westfalia Separator AG Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AAGAARD, Poul-Erik Vestergaardsvej 75 Rögen DK-8472 Sporup / DK | 02 /
BRÖKER, Klaus-Dieter Wiesenstrasse 14a 59302 Oelde / DE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763133.8 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004EP07518 | Priority number, date | DE2003131732 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331732 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007296 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1644122 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1644122 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/02, B04B1/08 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B04B1/08 (EP,US);
B04B5/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/15] | B04B5/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, IT, SE [2006/42] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGE MIT MEHREREN SCHLEUDERTROMMELN MIT TELLERPAKETEN | [2006/15] | English: | CENTRIFUGE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF CENTRIFUGAL DRUMS PROVIDED WITH PACKETS OF DISKS | [2006/15] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE COMPORTANT PLUSIEURS TAMBOURS DE CENTRIFUGATION POURVUS DE PAQUETS DE DISQUES | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 04.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 10.02.2010 | IT | 10.02.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/15] | DK | 10.02.2010 | |
IT | 10.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | DK | 10.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]SU1556761 ; | [Y]DE106703 (M.GÜTTNER) [Y] 8-10,13,18-20 * the whole document *; | [YD]DE1432853 (RUBISSOW GEORGE A) [YD] 15 * figures 1,7-12 *; | [Y]US4228950 (ITO YOICHIRO) [Y] 21 * figures 1,3; claim 12 *; | [X]DE78491 (C.A.HULT) [X] 1-7,12,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR558915 (P.-E.MAYNARD); | [A]CH377723 (FRAUCHIGER HANS [CH]) | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 17, Database accession no. 1991-123944, XP002303894 & SU1556761 A 19900415 (KALOSHIN A F) [X] 1-7,11,12,14,16,17 * abstract * [Y] 8-10,13,15,18-21 | by applicant | DE78491 | DE20010743U | DE3131320 | US3092579 | DE1432853 | DE4013388 | BE703747 | SU1556761 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 117, Database accession no. 1991-123944, & SU1556761 A1 19900415 |