Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006005358 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP07645 | 10.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1781717 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | B1 | EP1781717 | 09.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP07645 | 10.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2394336T | 30.01.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP07645 | 10.07.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1781717T | 28.06.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP07645 | 10.07.2004 | EP04763167 | 10.07.2004 |