EP1646916 - METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TIME-DEPENDENT PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/16] | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TIME-DEPENDENT PROCESSES AND TOOTHBRUSH | ||
[2009/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANGE, Pedro Ostpreussenstrasse 6(b) 65582 Diez / DE | 02 /
HORBASCHEK, Klaus Hopfengraben 18 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
STANGE, Pedro Bergstr. 4 65817 Eppstein / DE | ||
02 /
HORBASCHEK, Klaus Hopfengraben 18 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763330.0 | 19.07.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004EP08044 | Priority number, date | DE2003132873 | 19.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10332873 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005010624 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646916 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646916 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04F13/06, G04F1/06 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A46B15/0008 (EP,US);
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B15/0038 (EP,US);
G04F1/06 (EP,US);
G04F13/06 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/16] | G04F13/06, G04F1/06, A46B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON ZEITABHÄNGIGEN VORGÄNGEN | [2009/19] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TIME-DEPENDENT PROCESSES | [2009/19] | French: | PROCEDE D'INDICATION DE PROCESSUS TEMPORELS | [2009/19] |
Former [2006/16] | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON ZEITABHÄNGIGEN VORGÄNGEN UND ZAHNBÜRSTE | ||
Former [2006/16] | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING TIME-DEPENDENT PROCESSES AND TOOTHBRUSH | ||
Former [2006/16] | PROCEDE D'INDICATION DE PROCESSUS TEMPORELS ET BROSSE A DENTS | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IE | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | NL | 16.09.2009 | PL | 16.09.2009 | RO | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | PT | 18.01.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | BG | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5528563 (TOTHILL THOMAS W [NZ], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *[A] 5; | [XA]WO03007088 (TIMESTRIP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 15 * * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 11 * * figures 1a-c * [A] 5 |