EP1665647 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SETTING UP AD HOC NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4G Systems GmbH Jarrestrasse 4 22303 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states 4G Systems GmbH Goldbekplatz 3 22303 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states 4G Systeme GmbH Goldbekplatz 3 22303 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOR, Alexander P., 4G Systeme GmbH Am Sandtorkai 71 20457 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
CAR, Christian, 4G Systeme GmbH Am Sandtorkai 71 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763412.6 | 23.07.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP08216 | Priority number, date | DE2003153851 | 18.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10353851 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005053233 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1665647 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H04W40/02 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/122 (EP,US);
H04L45/124 (EP,US);
H04L45/20 (EP,US);
H04W8/087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINRICHTUNG VON AD-HOC NETZWERKEN | [2006/23] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SETTING UP AD HOC NETWORKS | [2006/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE RESEAUX AD HOC | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - YASUNORI OWADA, KENICHI MASE, "A Study on Protocol, Implementation and Throughput Evaluation for Multihop Wireless LAN", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. VTC 2003-SPRING. THE 57TH IEEE SEMIANNUAL, vol. 3, (20030422), pages 1773 - 1777, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org, (20041122), XP002306859 [X] 1-3,6,7,10-13,17-19,21,22 * abstract * * page 1773, column L - page 1776, column L * * figures 1-4 * [I] 4,5,8,9,14-16,20,23 | [XI] - JON AGRE, "PERVASIVE COMPUTING RESEARCH AND HOMELAND SECURITY", RESEARCH PROJECTS OF FUJITSU LABORATORIES OF AMERICA - COLLEGE PARK, MARYLAND, (200304), URL: http://www.mindlab.umd.edu/documents/perv_comp.pdf, (20041122), XP002306860 [X] 1-3,6,7,10-13,17-19,21,22 * Folie 13 (SNoWNet Secure Nomadic Wireless Networks) - Folie 18 (SNOWNET in Action) * [I] 4,5,8,9,14-16,20,23 | [A] - ROYER E M ET AL, "A REVIEW OF CURRENT ROUTING PROTOCOLS FOR AD HOC MOBILE WIRELESS NETWORKS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (199904), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 46 - 55, XP000823968 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.760423 |