Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
14.12.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
01.11.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
01.11.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
05.10.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
18.09.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
07.08.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.06.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.03.2007 | First examination report | |
27.03.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.01.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
21.07.2006 | Change - applicant | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
20.07.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.06.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] |
09.06.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] |
08.06.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.02.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.06.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.05.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication |