EP1656274 - HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM USED FOR THE COVERS OF VEHICLE OPENINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Fahrzeug-Dachsysteme GmbH Am Radeland 125 21079 Hamburg / DE | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARK, Michael Uhlandstrasse 87 74376 Kirchheim a. Neckar / DE | 02 /
HESS, Reiner Talblick 47 72336 Balingen-Ostdorf / DE | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Wittner, Walter, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | Wittner, Walter, et al Wittner & Müller Patentanwälte Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763717.8 | 02.08.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004EP08649 | Priority number, date | DE2003138551 | 19.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10338551 | [2006/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018972 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1656274 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1656274 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/12 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
F15B15/262 (EP,US);
F15B11/046 (EP,US);
F15B9/03 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3144 (EP,US);
F15B2211/327 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6326 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/47] |
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜ R ABDECKUNGEN VON FAHRZEUGÖFFNUNGEN | [2006/20] | English: | HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM USED FOR THE COVERS OF VEHICLE OPENINGS | [2006/20] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT HYDRAULIQUE POUR DES COUVERTURES D'OUVERTURES DE VEHICULES | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 21.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003005692 (MENTINK LAURENTIUS ANDREAS GER [NL], et al) [X] 1-4 * column A * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0108]; figure -; claims 1-3 * [Y] 5,6; | [XA]US2952127 (PARSONS JOHN B) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 14 - column 5, line 22; figure - * [A] 2,4-6; | [Y]US5778671 (BLOOMQUIST JAMES V [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column A * * column 6, line 1 - line 3 *; | [Y]EP0546300 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [XA]US3613818 (SCHUBERT GEORGE, et al) [X] 1,3 * column A * * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 16; figure - * [A] 2,4-6 |