EP1664137 - MULTISTEP PROCESS FOR PREPARING HETEROPHASIC PROPYLENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESCONI, Luigi Via Palestro 101 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 02 /
FERRARI, Paolo Via Leati, 18 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
CECCHIN, Giuliano Via dei Gelsomini, 50 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Sacco, Marco Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44100 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 04763806.9 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004EP08759 | Priority number, date | EP20030102736 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03102736 | US20030503234P | 16.09.2003 Original published format: US 503234 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023889 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664137 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F297/08, C08F210/06, C08L23/14 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F297/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F297/083 (EP,US);
C08F4/02 (KR);
C08F4/642 (KR);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08L2207/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/027 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2006/23] | C08F297/08, C08F4/02, C08F4/642 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHRITTVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HETEROPHASIGEN PROPYLENCOPOLYMEREN | [2006/23] | English: | MULTISTEP PROCESS FOR PREPARING HETEROPHASIC PROPYLENE COPOLYMERS | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE EN PLUSIEURS ETAPES DESTINE A LA FABRICATION DE COPOLYMERES DE PROPYLENE HETEROPHASIQUES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0704463 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 17* the whole document *; | [X]US6383969 (FRANCOIS PHILIPPE [BE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-16 * column 8, line 65 - line 68 * * example - *; | [A]US2002107344 (PETERSON THOMAS HENRY [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0091] * * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO03046022 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * example -; claim - * |