EP1644221 - BLOCKING ELEMENT FOR PREVENTING MALOPERATION OF A FLAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Schneider Kunststoffwerke GmbH Lindenstr. 10-12 96317 Kronach-Neuses / DE | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Dr. Schneider Engineering GmbH Lindenstrasse 10-12 96317 Kronach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Klaus Königsberger Strasse 1a 96342 Stockheim / DE | 02 /
UHLENBUSCH, Olaf Obristfelder Strasse 8c 96275 Marktzeuln / DE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Eichstädt, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | Application number, filing date | 04763815.0 | 05.08.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004EP08771 | Priority number, date | DE2003136506 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10336506 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016696 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1644221 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1644221 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, E05C19/02 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
E05C19/022 (EP);
B60R11/02 (EP);
B60R2011/0094 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPERRE ZUM VERHINDERN EINER FEHLBEDIENUNG EINER KLAPPE | [2006/15] | English: | BLOCKING ELEMENT FOR PREVENTING MALOPERATION OF A FLAP | [2006/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR EVITER LES ERREURS DE MANIPULATION D'UN VOLET | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 20.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IE | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | PL | 25.11.2009 | RO | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SI | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | AT | 05.08.2010 | GB | 05.08.2010 | IT | 05.08.2010 | LU | 05.08.2010 | ES | 06.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
AT | 05.08.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
IT | 05.08.2010 | ||
LU | 05.08.2010 | ||
ES | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
AT | 05.08.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
IT | 05.08.2010 | ||
ES | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
AT | 05.08.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
IT | 05.08.2010 | ||
ES | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
IT | 05.08.2010 | ||
ES | 06.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
GB | 05.08.2010 | ||
IT | 05.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IT | 05.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IE | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
RO | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
PL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SI | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE3538224 (SCHAEFER ERWIN) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 38 *; | [A]FR2785578 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - page 7, line 32 *; | [A]DE10008887 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,2* figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE3538224 | DE29811584U | DE10044557 |